Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
09.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
15.04.2013 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
29.03.2013 | Definitive list of designations | published on 01.05.2013 [2013/18] |
29.10.2012 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
27.07.2012 | Change - English title | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] |
20.07.2012 | Publication of search report | published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] |
20.07.2012 | Change - classification | published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] |
20.07.2012 | Change - classification | published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] |
04.08.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.10.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.09.2010 | Change - representative | published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] |
07.10.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.04.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.03.2007 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 11.04.2007 [2007/15] |