Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007080277 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN200520015353 | 08.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2006100726 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2006 | A4 | Priority number | Date | CN200520015353 | 08.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1772575 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2012 | A3 | EP1772575 | 11.04.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CN200520015353 | 08.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2559335 | 08.04.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN200520015353 | 08.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN2830862Y | 25.10.2006 | Y | Priority number | Date | CN200520015353 | 08.10.2005 |