EP1792603 - Cosmetic O/W-emulsion comprising 1,2-hexanediol. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beiersdorf AG Unnastrasse 48 20253 Hamburg / DE | [2011/04] |
Former [2007/23] | For all designated states Beiersdorf AG Unnastrasse 48 20253 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Behrens, Svea Kirchdorferstrasse 224h 21109, Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Bleckmann, Andreas Richard-Dehmel-Strasse 33 22926, Ahrensburg / DE | 03 /
Kröpke, Rainer Achterndieck 23 22869, Schenefeld / DE | 04 /
Meiring, Uta Im Dahlen 12A 21077, Hamburg / DE | 05 /
Nielsen, Jens Adlerhorst 20d 25448, Henstedt-Ulzburg / DE | [2007/23] | Application number, filing date | 06121502.6 | 29.09.2006 | [2007/23] | Priority number, date | DE20051051864 | 25.10.2005 Original published format: DE102005051864 | [2007/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1792603 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1792603 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/34, A61K8/04, A61Q19/00 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/06 (EP,US);
A61K8/345 (EP,US);
A61K8/375 (EP,US);
A61K8/608 (EP,US);
A61K8/86 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/23] | Title | German: | Kosmetische O/W-Emulsion mit 1,2-Hexandiol | [2007/23] | English: | Cosmetic O/W-emulsion comprising 1,2-hexanediol. | [2007/23] | French: | Une émulsion cosmétique huile/eau comprenant 1,2-hexanediol | [2007/23] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 08.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.09.2010 | 09.09.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.01.2011 | CZ | 26.01.2011 | DK | 26.01.2011 | EE | 26.01.2011 | FI | 26.01.2011 | HU | 26.01.2011 | IE | 26.01.2011 | IT | 26.01.2011 | LT | 26.01.2011 | LV | 26.01.2011 | NL | 26.01.2011 | PL | 26.01.2011 | RO | 26.01.2011 | SE | 26.01.2011 | SI | 26.01.2011 | SK | 26.01.2011 | TR | 26.01.2011 | BG | 26.04.2011 | GR | 27.04.2011 | IS | 26.05.2011 | PT | 26.05.2011 | AT | 29.09.2011 | LU | 29.09.2011 | BE | 30.09.2011 | CH | 30.09.2011 | LI | 30.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
IT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
TR | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
AT | 29.09.2011 | ||
LU | 29.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
IT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
AT | 29.09.2011 | ||
LU | 29.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
IT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
AT | 29.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
IT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/30] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
IT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
IT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 26.01.2011 | |
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03069994 (DRAGOCO GERBERDING CO AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * table 2 *; | [X]EP1426029 (MANDOM CORP [JP]) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] - [0020] - [0022] - [0049]; examples 2-4,10,11,16,17,22,23 *; | [X]WO2004050045 (DOW CORNING [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 8, line 10 - page 9, line 10; examples IV,VII,VIII *; | [PX]WO2006045743 (SYMRISE GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [PX] 1-10* page 16, line 10 - page 17, line 20 *; | [PX]WO2006082151 (SYMRISE GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [PX] 1-10 * page 17, lines 11-16; table 1 * |