EP1905876 - High speed circular knitting machine with a floss blowing and heat dissipating apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/14] | Floss blowing and heat dissipating apparatus for high speed circular knitting machines | ||
[2009/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pai Lung Machinery Mill Co., Ltd. No.8, Ting Ping Rd., Jui-Fang Chen Taipei Hsien / TW | [2008/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pai, Tieh-Hsiung No. 8, Ting-Ping Rd. Jui-Fang Town, Taipei Hsien / TW | [2008/14] | Representative(s) | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft mbB Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | Patentanwälte Kewitz & Kollegen Partnerschaft, Corneliusstrasse 18 60325 Frankfurt a.M. / DE | Application number, filing date | 06121568.7 | 29.09.2006 | [2008/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1905876 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1905876 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | D04B35/30 | [2008/14] | CPC: |
D04B35/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/05] |
Former [2009/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, LI | ||
Former [2008/50] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hochgeschwindigkeitsrundstrickmaschine mit einer Faserabfällenluftblas- und Wärmeabfuhrvorrichtung | [2009/13] | English: | High speed circular knitting machine with a floss blowing and heat dissipating apparatus | [2009/13] | French: | Métier à tricoter circulaire à grande vitesse avec un appareil pour souffler la bourre et dissiper la chaleur | [2009/13] |
Former [2008/14] | Faserabfällenluftblas- und Wärmeabfuhrvorrichtung für eine Rundstrickmaschine | ||
Former [2008/14] | Floss blowing and heat dissipating apparatus for high speed circular knitting machines | ||
Former [2008/14] | Appareil pour souffler la bourre et dissiper la chaleur pour une métier à tricoter rectiligne | Examination procedure | 31.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2007 | Examination requested [2009/05] | 18.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.11.2009 | BE | 11.11.2009 | CY | 11.11.2009 | CZ | 11.11.2009 | DK | 11.11.2009 | EE | 11.11.2009 | FI | 11.11.2009 | LT | 11.11.2009 | LV | 11.11.2009 | NL | 11.11.2009 | PL | 11.11.2009 | RO | 11.11.2009 | SE | 11.11.2009 | SI | 11.11.2009 | SK | 11.11.2009 | BG | 11.02.2010 | GR | 12.02.2010 | ES | 22.02.2010 | IS | 11.03.2010 | PT | 11.03.2010 | HU | 12.05.2010 | [2012/44] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
LT | 11.11.2009 | ||
LV | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
IS | 11.03.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
HU | 12.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
LT | 11.11.2009 | ||
LV | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
IS | 11.03.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/41] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
LT | 11.11.2009 | ||
LV | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
IS | 11.03.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/31] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
LT | 11.11.2009 | ||
LV | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
IS | 11.03.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
LT | 11.11.2009 | ||
LV | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
IS | 11.03.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
LT | 11.11.2009 | ||
LV | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
IS | 11.03.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 22.02.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3219467 (TEXTIMA VEB K [DD]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5737942 (GUTSCHMIT ALAN [US]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]US6199408 (SHIBATA TAKAO [JP]) [DA] 1* the whole document *; | [A]EP1650336 (SIPRA PATENT BETEILIGUNG [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0024]; figure . * |