Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] |
20.01.2015 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
16.01.2015 | Definitive list of designations | published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
19.12.2014 | Request for examination filed | published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] |
19.12.2014 | Change - designated states | published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] |
06.11.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.05.2014 | Publication of search report | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
09.05.2014 | Change - classification | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
09.05.2014 | Change - classification | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
05.11.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.11.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
07.11.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.10.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.10.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.10.2008 | Change: Renewal fee paid | |
22.10.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.04.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 14.05.2008 [2008/20] |
16.03.2007 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] |