03.01.2020 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 05.02.2020 [2020/06] |
05.12.2019 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
11.09.2019 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
25.03.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.03.2019 |
Change - German title |
published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] |
22.03.2019 |
Change - English title |
published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] |
22.03.2019 |
Change - French title |
published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] |
02.11.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.06.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.02.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.10.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.10.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.11.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.11.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.11.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.11.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.11.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.05.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.12.2009 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 27.01.2010 [2010/04] |
18.12.2009 |
First examination report |
|
17.12.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.11.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] |
04.11.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.04.2009 |
Publication of search report |
published on 20.05.2009 [2009/21] |
11.11.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.08.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] |
09.03.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.04.2007 [2007/15] |