EP1775357 - Angular servo-motor for the controlled positioning of elements connected to weft or warp yarns in a weaving machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smit S.p.A. - Unipersonale Viale dell'Industria 135 36015 SCHIO (Vicenza) / IT | [2007/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bonollo, Fabio Via XXIX Aprile, 64 36036 Torrebelvicino (Vicenza) / IT | 02 /
Perrone, Vittorio Via Giovanni Paolo I, 1/2 36034 Malo (Vicenza) / IT | 03 /
Pezzin, Stefano Via Caussa 67 36015 Schio (Vicenza) / IT | [2007/16] | Representative(s) | Iannone, Carlo Luigi, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/11] | Iannone, Carlo Luigi, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | ||
Former [2007/41] | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2007/16] | Coppo, Alessandro, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A., Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 06122076.0 | 11.10.2006 | [2007/16] | Priority number, date | IT2005VI00276 | 17.10.2005 Original published format: IT VI20050276 | [2007/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1775357 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1775357 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | D03C13/00, D03C11/00 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
D03C11/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, IT, LI [2008/13] |
Former [2007/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Winkelservomotor zur gesteuerten Positionierung von mit dem Schussfaden oder Kettfaden verbundenen Elementen in einer Webmaschine | [2007/16] | English: | Angular servo-motor for the controlled positioning of elements connected to weft or warp yarns in a weaving machine | [2007/16] | French: | Servomoteur angulaire pour contrôler la position des éléments qui sont connectés avec les fils de trame ou les fils de chaîne, dans un métier à tisser | [2007/16] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/06] | 19.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/37] | 26.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH09268450 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US6006792 (KRUMM VALENTIN [DE], et al) [A] 9 * column 3, lines 1-24; figures 1,3 * * column 1, lines 65,66 ** column 2, lines 1-67 *; | [A]EP1052766 (LGL ELECTRONICS SPA [IT]) [A] 2 * paragraphs [0001] - [0015] *; | [Y]US6189576 (MARKWARD DIETMAR [CH]) [Y] 7-9 * column 1, lines 27-47; figures 1-10 * * column 1, lines 65,66 * * column 2, lines 1-65; claim 1 *; | [X]US6227253 (MEYNS IGNACE [BE]) [X] 1,2 * figures 1,8 * * column 3, lines 48-67 * * column 5, lines 54-67 * * column 6, lines 1-8 *; | [XY]US2002124901 (KRUMM VALENTIN [DE]) [X] 1 * figures 1,4 * * page 2, paragraphs 15-21 * * page 3, paragraphs 30-34 * * claims 1,15,20 * [Y] 3-9; | [Y]US6913044 (ZWEHL DIETMAR VON [DE], et al) [Y] 3-6 * columns 2,3; figure 1A * * column 6, lines 43-67 * * column 7, lines 1-8 * * claim 18 * |