EP1912047 - Electronic scale [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 23.08.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mettler-Toledo GmbH Im Langacher 44 8606 Greifensee / CH | [2016/07] |
Former [2008/16] | For all designated states Mettler-Toledo AG Im Langacher 8606 Greifensee / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nufer, Bruno Hagenwies 43 8308, Illnau / CH | 02 /
Zeiss, Siegfried Zinkereistrasse 24 8633, Wolfhausen / CH | [2019/39] |
Former [2008/16] | 01 /
Nufer, Bruno Hagenwies 43 8308, Illnau / CH | ||
02 /
Zeiss, Siegfried Zinkereistrasse 24 8633, Wolfhausen / CH | Representative(s) | Mettler-Toledo IP Department Im Langacher 44 8606 Greifensee / CH | [2019/39] |
Former [2010/44] | Mettler-Toledo IP Department Im Langacher 44 8606 Greifensee / CH | Application number, filing date | 06122083.6 | 11.10.2006 | [2008/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1912047 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1912047 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/13] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1912047 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01G21/28 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
G01G21/286 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/39] |
Former [2008/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektronische Waage | [2008/16] | English: | Electronic scale | [2008/16] | French: | Balance électronique | [2008/16] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 18.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.11.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 04.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.12.2011
12.01.2012
ADMISSIBLE Wipotec Wiege- und Positioniersysteme GmbH Adam-Hoffmann-Strasse 26 67657 Kaiserslautern / DE Opponent's representative Eder, Thomas Eder Schieschke & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Elisabethstrasse 34/II 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.12.2011
Wipotec Wiege- und Positioniersysteme GmbH Adam-Hoffmann-Strasse 26 67657 Kaiserslautern / DE Opponent's representative Eder, Thomas Eder & Schieschke Patentanwälte Elisabethstrasse 34 80796 München / DE | 07.02.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.08.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.03.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.08.2014 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 26.08.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.03.2019 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 16.08.2019 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 22.10.2014 | Appeal received No. T2098/14 | 05.01.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 19.03.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 19.03.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.03.2019 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.03.2011 | CZ | 30.03.2011 | DK | 30.03.2011 | EE | 30.03.2011 | FI | 30.03.2011 | HU | 30.03.2011 | LT | 30.03.2011 | LV | 30.03.2011 | NL | 30.03.2011 | PL | 30.03.2011 | RO | 30.03.2011 | SE | 30.03.2011 | SI | 30.03.2011 | SK | 30.03.2011 | TR | 30.03.2011 | BG | 30.06.2011 | GR | 01.07.2011 | ES | 11.07.2011 | IS | 30.07.2011 | PT | 01.08.2011 | AT | 11.10.2011 | LU | 11.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | GB | 11.10.2012 | IT | 11.10.2012 | BE | 31.10.2012 | FR | 31.10.2013 | IE | 11.10.2018 | [2019/48] |
Former [2018/17] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HU | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
TR | 30.03.2011 | ||
BG | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
AT | 11.10.2011 | ||
LU | 11.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 11.10.2012 | ||
IT | 11.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HU | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
TR | 30.03.2011 | ||
BG | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
AT | 11.10.2011 | ||
LU | 11.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 11.10.2012 | ||
IT | 11.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2013/45] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
HU | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
TR | 30.03.2011 | ||
BG | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
AT | 11.10.2011 | ||
LU | 11.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 11.10.2012 | ||
IT | 11.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/44] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
TR | 30.03.2011 | ||
BG | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
AT | 11.10.2011 | ||
LU | 11.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 11.10.2012 | ||
IT | 11.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
BG | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
AT | 11.10.2011 | ||
LU | 11.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 11.10.2012 | ||
IT | 11.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
BG | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
AT | 11.10.2011 | ||
LU | 11.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 11.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
BG | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
AT | 11.10.2011 | ||
LU | 11.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 11.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
BG | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
AT | 11.10.2011 | ||
LU | 11.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
NL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 30.03.2011 | |
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 30.03.2011 | |
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
SE | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3601408 (SARTORIUS GMBH) [A] 1-13 * column 3, line 22 - column 4, line 10; figures 3,4 *; | [A]DE10032398 (METTLER TOLEDO GMBH [CH]) [A] 1-13 * column 4, line 22 - column 5, line 64; figures 4,5a,5b,6,7 *; | [A]EP1195584 (METTLER TOLEDO GMBH [CH]) [A] 1-13* paragraph [0039]; figures 9a,9b * | Opposition | EP1195586 |