EP1777666 - Method, system and business model for electronic betting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2011 | Change - representative | published on 02.03.2011 [2011/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cinnober Financial Technology AB Kungsgatan 36 111 35 Stockholm / SE | [2008/52] |
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states Cinnober Financial Technology AB Industrigatan 2A 112 46 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lenti Peter Klockargården Brottby 186 97 / SE | [2007/17] | Representative(s) | Engdahl, Stefan, et al Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/09] | Engdahl, Stefan, et al AWAPATENT AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2008/52] | Bergholtz Arkelius, Per Christian Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2007/17] | Loqvist, Gabriel Mathias Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 06122085.1 | 11.10.2006 | [2007/17] | Priority number, date | US20050726382P | 13.10.2005 Original published format: US 726382 P | [2007/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1777666 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G07F17/32 | [2007/17] | CPC: |
G07F17/3288 (EP,US);
G06Q50/34 (EP,US);
G07F17/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren, System und Geschäftsmodell für elektronische Wetten | [2007/17] | English: | Method, system and business model for electronic betting | [2007/17] | French: | Procédé, système et modèle commercial pour les paris électroniques | [2007/17] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 04.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/50] | 21.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0155941 (FLUTTER COM LTD [US]) [A] 1-23* the whole document *; | [X]WO0183058 (CFPH LLC [US]) [X] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002155885 (SHVILI OMER [US]) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003008711 (CORBO DANA [US]) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [X]US2003096651 (BLACK ANDREW WILSON [GB]) [X] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [X]US2004015429 (TIGHE JOSEPH MICHAEL [GB], et al) [X] 1-23 * the whole document * |