EP1912486 - Device for fixing a fan to a surface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/16] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knight, Simon 53, Llewellyn Street Gilfach goch Near Porth RCT CF39 8UA / GB | [2008/16] | Representative(s) | Berthier, Karine THOMSON European Patent Operations 46 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/16] | Berthier, Karine THOMSON, European Patent Operations, 46 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 06122199.0 | 12.10.2006 | [2008/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1912486 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
H05K7/20172 (EP);
F04D29/601 (EP);
F04D29/668 (EP);
F16F15/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/52] |
Former [2008/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Festmachen eines Ventilators an eine Oberfläche | [2008/16] | English: | Device for fixing a fan to a surface | [2008/16] | French: | Dispositif de fixation d'un ventilateur sur une surface | [2008/16] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/16] | 24.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE20219814U (THOMA PETER [DE]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]US2005063155 (ENDO RYOICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,7 * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0037] *; | [A]DE202006010011U (SHARKOON TECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5713790 (LIN MAO-YU [TW]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 12 - line 19 *; | [A]US5208730 (TRACY MARK S [US]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 10 - line 15; figure 3 *; | [A]EP0135845 (NIXDORF COMPUTER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5917698 (VIALLET FRANCK [FR]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 1 - line 5 *; | [A]US2005106008 (PARK CHUL M [KR], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * |