EP1777950 - Display apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pak, Sung-youn Grand Officetel 801 602-35 Namhyeon-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
Yun, Young-hwa Daerim Apt., 105-1101 Daebang-dong Dongjak-gu Seoul / KR | [2007/17] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/17] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06122305.3 | 13.10.2006 | [2007/17] | Priority number, date | KR20050099495 | 21.10.2005 Original published format: KR 20050099495 | [2007/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1777950 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1777950 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445, H04N5/44, H04N5/45, G09G5/00 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
G06F3/0482 (EP,US);
G06F3/14 (KR);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N21/4316 (EP,US);
H04N21/440263 (EP,US);
H04N21/4858 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/17] | H04N5/445 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [2008/08] |
Former [2007/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Anzeigevorrichtung | [2007/17] | English: | Display apparatus | [2007/17] | French: | Appareil d'affichage | [2007/17] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/17] | 14.12.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/29] | 25.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5751373 (OHYAMA TOMOKO [JP], et al) [A] 8,9,18,19 * paragraphs [0009] - [0014]; figures 2A-C,3,4A-B *; | [A]EP0860998 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 4-7,10,14-17,20 * figures 4,5,12; claim 2 *; | [A]EP0984628 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 4-7,10,14-17,20 * paragraphs [0009] - [0014]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]WO0104868 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 4,5,10,14,15,18-20,25 * page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 4, line 11, paragraph 3 - line 14 * * page 5, line 3 - line 4 * * page 5, line 9 - line 10 * * page 10, line 8 - line 10 * * page 10, line 19 - line 23 * * page 11, line 4 - line 7 * * page 16, line 7 - line 8 * * page 17, line 16 - line 18; figure 9 *; | [A]US2003081931 (NANBA YOUSUKE [JP]) [A] 4-7,10,14-17,20 * paragraphs [0006] - [0008] - [0010] - [0012] - [0020] - [0022]; figures 4-6 *; | [A]US2004028375 (KIM CHUL-MIN [KR], et al) [A] 8,9,18,19* paragraphs [0008] - [0010]; figures 4-6 *; | [X]EP1460525 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007]; figures 1,2A-E *; | [X]EP1517547 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,11 * paragraphs [0010] , [0016] , [0021] , [0045]; figures 1,2A,2B,4; claims 8,11 *; | [XY] - PAUL THURROTT, "Windows XP Media Center Edition reviewed", N/A, Internet, (20021011), URL: http://www.winsupersite.com/reviews/windowsxp_mediacenter.asp, (20070417), XP002430294 [X] 1-3,8,9,11-13 * the whole document * [Y] 4,5,10,14,15,18-20,25 | Examination | WO0249351 |