EP1764047 - Apparatus for sampling body fluid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roche Diagnostics Operations, Inc. 9115 Hague Road Indianapolis, Indiana 46250 / US | [2007/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Douglas, Joel S. 66 Neptune Drive Groton, CT 06340 / US | 02 /
Roe, Jeffrey N. 3212 Veracruz Drive San Ramon CA 94583 / US | 03 /
Radwanski, Ryszard Ulica, Junoszy 3/1 20-059 Lublin / PL | 04 /
Duchon, Brent G. 410 Milan Drive 106 San Jose CA 95134 / US | [2007/36] |
Former [2007/12] | 01 /
Douglas, Joel S. 25285 La Loma Drive Los Altos Hills CA 94022 / US | ||
02 /
Roe, Jeffrey N. 3212 Veracruz Drive San Ramon CA 94583 / US | |||
03 /
Radwanski, Ryszard 16830 Sundance Drive Morgan Hill CA 95037 / US | |||
04 /
Duchon, Brent G. 410 Milan Drive 106 San Jose CA 95134 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/12] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06122649.4 | 16.05.1997 | [2007/12] | Priority number, date | US19960017133P | 17.05.1996 Original published format: US 17133 P | US19960019918P | 14.06.1996 Original published format: US 19918 P | US19960023658P | 01.08.1996 Original published format: US 23658 P | US19960025340P | 03.09.1996 Original published format: US 25340 P | US19960714548 | 16.09.1996 Original published format: US 714548 | US19960064856P | 17.09.1996 Original published format: US 64856 P | US19960727074 | 08.10.1996 Original published format: US 727074 | [2007/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1764047 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1764047 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | [2008/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1764047 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/32, A61B5/00, A61B10/00 | [2008/04] | CPC: |
A61B5/150198 (EP);
A61B17/32053 (EP);
A61B17/32093 (EP);
A61B5/14514 (EP);
A61B5/150022 (EP);
A61B5/150068 (EP);
A61B5/150083 (EP);
A61B5/150236 (EP);
A61B5/150244 (EP);
A61B5/150396 (EP);
A61B5/150511 (EP);
A61B5/15113 (EP);
A61B5/15117 (EP);
A61B5/1519 (EP);
A61B5/15194 (EP);
A61B10/0064 (EP);
A61B2010/008 (EP);
A61B2010/0208 (EP);
A61B5/15019 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/12] | A61B17/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2007/12] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Probenentnahme von Körperflüssigkeit | [2007/12] | English: | Apparatus for sampling body fluid | [2007/12] | French: | Appareil de prelevement de liquide organique | [2007/12] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 26.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.03.2012 | 14.03.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97925620.3 / EP0904022 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19970925620) is 07.03.2005 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.06.2012 | BE | 20.06.2012 | DK | 20.06.2012 | FI | 20.06.2012 | MC | 20.06.2012 | SE | 20.06.2012 | GR | 21.09.2012 | PT | 22.10.2012 | [2014/03] |
Former [2013/21] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
SE | 20.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4154228 (CRAWFORD DONALD W [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, lines 40-58 *; | [A]US4895147 (BODICKY RAYMOND O [US], et al) [A] * abstract *; | [A]US5282822 (MACORS PAUL P M G J [US], et al) [A] * abstract *; | [A]WO9408655 (ENDODERMIC MEDICAL TECH [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [XA]WO9510223 (INOMET INC [US]) [X] 1-7,9-11,13,14 * abstract * * page 11, line 20 - page 15, line 2 * [A] 8,12 |