EP1781055 - Apparatus and method of determining uplink priority in wireless mobile communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2007/18] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong, Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Young-Soon c/o Samsung Electronics Co.,Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Ahn, Byung-Chan c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2007/18] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/50] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/21] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/18] | Zimmer, Franz-Josef Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06123038.9 | 26.10.2006 | [2007/18] | Priority number, date | KR20050101832 | 27.10.2005 Original published format: KR 20050101832 | [2007/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1781055 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1781055 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | [2011/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1781055 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12 | [2012/17] | CPC: |
H04W52/367 (EP,KR,US);
H04W28/22 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/267 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/346 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/1268 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/21 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/569 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/18] | H04Q7/30 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2012/11] |
Former [2007/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Bestimmen der Aufwärtspriorität in einem drahtlosen Mobilkommunikationssystem | [2007/18] | English: | Apparatus and method of determining uplink priority in wireless mobile communication system | [2007/18] | French: | Dispositif et méthode de détermination de la priorité dans la liaison montante dans un système de communication sans fil | [2007/18] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 12.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.02.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 04.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 12.12.2012 | SE | 12.12.2012 | [2014/03] |
Former [2013/21] | SE | 12.12.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002183066 (PANKAJ RAJESH K [US]); | [A]US2004102202 (KUMARAN KRISHNAN [US], et al); | [A]EP1511245 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2005063330 (LEE SUNG-JIN [KR], et al); | [A]WO2005034443 (FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al) |