EP1925996 - Device for correction of a display mechanism for a timepiece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETA SA Manufacture Horlogère Suisse Schild-Rust-Strasse 17 2540 Grenchen / CH | [2008/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pellaton, Loïc Fbg de la Gare 25 2000, Neuchâtel / CH | [2008/22] | Representative(s) | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/50] | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al I C B Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets 7, rue des Sors 2074 Marin / CH | ||
Former [2008/22] | Robert, Vincent, et al ICB S.A. Rue des Sors 7 2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 06123502.4 | 06.11.2006 | [2008/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1925996 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G04B19/25 | [2008/22] | CPC: |
G04B19/25 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/22] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Korrektur eines Anzeigemechanismus für eine Uhr | [2008/22] | English: | Device for correction of a display mechanism for a timepiece | [2008/22] | French: | Dispositif de correction d'un mécanisme d'affichage pour pièce d'horlogerie | [2008/22] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 12.10.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US476956 (GILL, T) [A] 1 * figures 2-5 ** page 1, lines 8-15 *; | [A]CH41619 (SANDOZ BOUCHERIN A [CH]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US4050233 (INGENIEUR KURT MURRLE) [A] 1 * figure 4 * * column 4, lines 17-20 *; | [A]EP0548659 (EBAUCHESFABRIK ETA AG [CH]) [A] 1-8 * figures 1-6 * * column 5, line 10 - column 11, line 13 *; | [DA]JP2000314778 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD) [DA] 1-8 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * |