EP1785125 - Hinge for connecting two elements of a patient support surface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAQUET GmbH & Co. KG Kehler Strasse 31 76437 Rastatt / DE | [2007/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katzenstein, Bernhard Mahlbergstraße 21 76532, Baden-Baden / DE | [2007/20] | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/20] | Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06123592.5 | 07.11.2006 | [2007/20] | Priority number, date | DE20051054175 | 14.11.2005 Original published format: DE102005054175 | [2007/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1785125 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1785125 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | [2008/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1785125 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61G13/12, A61G13/10, // A61G13/08 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
A61G13/12 (EP,US);
A61G7/05 (KR);
A61G7/00 (KR);
A61G13/08 (EP,US);
A61G13/122 (EP,US);
A61G13/1245 (EP,US);
A61G13/1295 (EP,US);
A61G2200/38 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32262 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32368 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32401 (EP,US);
Y10T403/59 (EP,US);
Y10T403/595 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/20] | A61G13/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/20] | Title | German: | Gelenkanordnung zur Verbindung zweier Segmente einer Patientenlagerfläche | [2007/20] | English: | Hinge for connecting two elements of a patient support surface | [2007/20] | French: | Charnière pour connecter deux éléments d'une surface de support d'un patient | [2007/20] | Examination procedure | 13.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 18.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.03.2009 | EE | 18.03.2009 | IE | 18.03.2009 | LT | 18.03.2009 | LV | 18.03.2009 | RO | 18.03.2009 | SI | 18.03.2009 | SK | 18.03.2009 | TR | 18.03.2009 | BG | 18.06.2009 | GR | 19.06.2009 | IS | 18.07.2009 | HU | 19.09.2009 | AT | 07.11.2009 | LU | 07.11.2009 | SE | 08.11.2009 | BE | 30.11.2009 | DK | 30.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | EE | 18.03.2009 | |
IE | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
GR | 19.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
HU | 19.09.2009 | ||
AT | 07.11.2009 | ||
LU | 07.11.2009 | ||
SE | 08.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
DK | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | EE | 18.03.2009 | |
IE | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
GR | 19.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
AT | 07.11.2009 | ||
LU | 07.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
DK | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/09] | EE | 18.03.2009 | |
IE | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
GR | 19.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
AT | 07.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
DK | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | EE | 18.03.2009 | |
IE | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
GR | 19.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | EE | 18.03.2009 | |
IE | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | EE | 18.03.2009 | |
IE | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/02] | EE | 18.03.2009 | |
IE | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3328079 (ERNEST BYCZKOWSKI, et al) [X] 1,2,6,7 * figures 1-6 * [Y] 8; | [X]GB1321193 (UNIVERSAL OIL PROD CO) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US2003078144 (GEHRKE JON C [US]) [Y] 8 * figure 9 *; | [DA]DE10253906 (MAQUET GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [DA] * the whole document * | by applicant | US3328079 |