EP1769797 - Methods and compositions using cetirizine in combination with leukotriene inhibitors for treating conditions responsive to leukotriene inhibition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/14] | Methods and compositions using cetirizine in combination with leukotriene Inhibitors for treating conditions responsive to leukotriene inhibitiion | ||
[2007/20] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sepracor Inc. 84 Waterford Drive Marlborough, Massachusetts 01752 / US | [2007/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rubin, Paul, D. 37 Greystone Lane Sudbury, MA 01776 / US | [2007/14] | Representative(s) | Cowley, Catherine Mary, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | Cowley, Catherine Mary, et al Venner Shipley LLP, 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06123637.8 | 13.04.1999 | [2007/14] | Priority number, date | US19980059571 | 14.04.1998 Original published format: US 59571 | [2007/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1769797 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1769797 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/06, A61K31/495 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K31/495 (EP,US);
A61P11/06 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/495, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/495, A61K31/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/495, A61K31/405 (US,EP);
A61K31/495, A61K31/41 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2007/14] | A61K31/495 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2007/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Zusammensetzungen unter Verwendung von Cetirizin in Verbindung mit Leukotrienhemmern zum Behandeln von Zuständen, die auf Leukotrienhemmung ansprechen | [2007/14] | English: | Methods and compositions using cetirizine in combination with leukotriene inhibitors for treating conditions responsive to leukotriene inhibition | [2007/20] | French: | Procédés et compositions utilisant de la cétirizine en combinaison avec des inhibiteurs de leucotriène pour le traitement des affections répondant à l'inhibition des leucotriènes | [2007/14] |
Former [2007/14] | Methods and compositions using cetirizine in combination with leukotriene Inhibitors for treating conditions responsive to leukotriene inhibitiion | Examination procedure | 29.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/14] | 10.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/16] | 27.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/16] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99917463.4 / EP1071461 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990917463) is 01.10.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2011 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0565185 (MERCK FROSST CANADA INC [CA]) [A] 1-52 * page 9, lines 7-11; claim 4 * * page 4, lines 15-27 * * page 3, lines 6-8; claim 8 *; | [X]EP0780127 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 14-19,26-31,33,35-38,45-52 * page 2, lines 41,42; example 2 * * page 3, lines 24-30; claims 1,4-6 * * page 4, lines 6-10 * * page 4, columns 38-42 *; | [E]WO9932125 (SCHERING CORP [US], et al) [E] 1-5,8-11,14-17,20-23,26-29,32-36,43-50* page 1, line 25 - page 3, line 10; claims 1,2,5,7,11,12 *; | [X] - DA MOTTA ET AL, "Drug Modulation of Antigen-Induced Paw Edema in Guinea Pigs: Effects of Lipopolysaccharide, Tumor Necrosis Factor and Leukocyte Depletion", BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (199405), vol. 112, no. 1, pages 111 - 116, XP002114975 [X] 45-50 * the whole document * | [A] - WEG V B ET AL, "HISTAMINE, LEUKOTRIENE D4 AND PLATELET-ACTIVATING FACTOR IN GUINEA PIG PASSIVE CUTANEOUS ANAPHYLAXIS", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER BV, NL, (19910101), vol. 204, no. 2, ISSN 0014-2999, pages 157 - 163, XP008061880 [A] 1-52 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-2999(91)90700-Z |