26.08.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] |
18.09.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] |
11.09.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
11.09.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
10.09.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
01.06.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.05.2015 |
Change - English title |
published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] |
24.04.2015 |
Change - German title |
published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
24.04.2015 |
Change - English title |
published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
24.04.2015 |
Change - French title |
published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
01.04.2015 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
14.01.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.12.2014 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
12.12.2014 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 14.01.2015 [2015/03] |
04.12.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.11.2014 |
Change - designated states |
published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] |
08.09.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.09.2014 |
First examination report |
|
17.07.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
11.07.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] |
04.04.2014 |
Publication of search report |
published on 07.05.2014 [2014/19] |
04.04.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.05.2014 [2014/19] |
20.12.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] |
04.12.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.12.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.12.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.12.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.12.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.04.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] |