EP1788455 - Method and system for improved control of xerographic parameters in a digital imaging system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/21] | Method and System for Improved Control of Xerographic Parameters in a High Quality Document System | ||
[2015/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester New York 14644 / US | [2007/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Updegraff, Shawn P. / 6009 Pittsford Palmyra Road Fairport, NY 14450 / US | 02 /
Gross, Eric M. / 311 Wilmot Road Rochester, NY 14618 / US | [2015/43] |
Former [2007/21] | 01 /
Updegraff, Shawn P. 6009 Pittsford Palmyra Road Fairport, NY 14450 / US | ||
02 /
Gross, Eric M. 311 Wilmot Road Rochester, NY 14618 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [2015/43] |
Former [2007/21] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06124050.3 | 14.11.2006 | [2007/21] | Priority number, date | US20050280796 | 16.11.2005 Original published format: US 280796 | [2007/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1788455 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1788455 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1788455 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/00 | [2007/21] | CPC: |
G03G15/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2014/51] |
Former [2007/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur verbesserten Kontrolle von xerografischen Parametern im digitalen Abbildungssystem | [2015/22] | English: | Method and system for improved control of xerographic parameters in a digital imaging system | [2015/27] | French: | Procédé et système pour le contrôle amélioré de paramètres xérographiques dans un système d'imagerie numérique | [2015/22] |
Former [2007/21] | Verfahren und System zur verbesserten Kontrolle von xerografischen Parametern in Hochqualitätsdokumentsystemen | ||
Former [2007/21] | Method and System for Improved Control of Xerographic Parameters in a High Quality Document System | ||
Former [2007/21] | Procédé et système pour le contrôle amélioré de paramètres xérographiques dans un système pour produire des document de grande qualité | Examination procedure | 24.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/33] | 09.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2014 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.12.2014 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5420614 (FUKUI KAZUYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,10 * column 6, line 42 - column 7, line 26; table 1 * [A] 5; | [A]EP1003326 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1-5,10 * paragraphs [0053] - [0063]; figure 33 *; | [A]US5831657 (SAKAUE EIICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5,10 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH10202937 (HITACHI KOKI KK) [A] 1-5,10 * abstract * |