EP1923902 - Magnetron sputtering source, sputter coating system and method for coating a substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 03.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2014/30] |
Former [2008/21] | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. a corporation of the State of Delaware 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krempel-Hesse, Jörg Espenweg 10 63683, Eckartsborn / DE | [2014/30] |
Former [2008/21] | 01 /
Krempel-Hesse, Jörg Espenweg 10 63683, Eckartsborn / DE | Representative(s) | Neuburger, Benedikt Maria, et al Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/45] | Neuburger, Benedikt Maria, et al Zimmermann & Partner Josephspitalstraße 15 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/21] | Lermer, Christoph, et al LangRaible GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Herzog-Wilhelm-Straße 22 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06124060.2 | 14.11.2006 | [2008/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1923902 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1923902 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/08] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1923902 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/34, C23C14/35 | [2008/21] | CPC: |
H01J37/3408 (EP,KR,US);
C23C14/3407 (EP,KR,US);
C23C14/3485 (KR);
C23C14/35 (EP,KR,US);
H01J37/3423 (EP,KR,US);
H01J37/3455 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/21] | Title | German: | Magnetron-Sputterquelle, Sputter-Beschichtungsanlage und Verfahren zur Beschichtung eines Substrats | [2008/21] | English: | Magnetron sputtering source, sputter coating system and method for coating a substrate | [2008/21] | French: | Source de pulvérisation magnétron, système de revêtement par pulvérisation et procédé pour revêtir un substrat | [2008/21] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2006 | Examination requested [2008/21] | 23.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.11.2011
29.11.2011
ADMISSIBLE von Ardenne Anlagentechnik GmbH Plattleite 19/29 01324 Dresden / DE Opponent's representative Adler, Peter Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Krenkelstrasse 3 01309 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.11.2011
von Ardenne Anlagentechnik GmbH Plattleite 19/29 01324 Dresden / DE Opponent's representative Adler, Peter Lippert, Stachow & Partner Krenkelstrasse 3 01309 Dresden / DE | 03.01.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.04.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.05.2012 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2012 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 05.11.2013 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 05.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.11.2013 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.11.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 11.06.2014 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.02.2011 | CZ | 23.02.2011 | DK | 23.02.2011 | EE | 23.02.2011 | FI | 23.02.2011 | HU | 23.02.2011 | IE | 23.02.2011 | IS | 23.02.2011 | IT | 23.02.2011 | LT | 23.02.2011 | LV | 23.02.2011 | NL | 23.02.2011 | PL | 23.02.2011 | RO | 23.02.2011 | SE | 23.02.2011 | SI | 23.02.2011 | SK | 23.02.2011 | TR | 23.02.2011 | BG | 23.05.2011 | GR | 24.05.2011 | ES | 03.06.2011 | PT | 23.06.2011 | AT | 14.11.2011 | GB | 14.11.2011 | LU | 14.11.2011 | BE | 30.11.2011 | CH | 30.11.2011 | FR | 30.11.2011 | LI | 30.11.2011 | MC | 30.11.2011 | [2018/17] |
Former [2015/21] | CY | 23.02.2011 | |
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HU | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IS | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
TR | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
AT | 14.11.2011 | ||
GB | 14.11.2011 | ||
LU | 14.11.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 23.02.2011 | |
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HU | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IS | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
TR | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
AT | 14.11.2011 | ||
GB | 14.11.2011 | ||
LU | 14.11.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/45] | CY | 23.02.2011 | |
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HU | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IS | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
TR | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
AT | 14.11.2011 | ||
GB | 14.11.2011 | ||
LU | 14.11.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/44] | CY | 23.02.2011 | |
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IS | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
TR | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
AT | 14.11.2011 | ||
GB | 14.11.2011 | ||
LU | 14.11.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 23.02.2011 | |
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IS | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
AT | 14.11.2011 | ||
GB | 14.11.2011 | ||
LU | 14.11.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | CY | 23.02.2011 | |
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 23.02.2011 | |
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 23.02.2011 | |
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | CY | 23.02.2011 | |
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 23.02.2011 | |
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 23.02.2011 | |
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5106474 (DICKEY ERIC R [US], et al) [X] 1,10,11,16-18 * column 4, line 14 - line 54 *; | [X]EP0858095 (INTEVAC INC [US]) [X] 1,8-10,16-18,22,24,25* column 6, line 50 - column 7, line 52; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US6013159 (ADAMS BRET W [US], et al) [X] 1,7-10,16,17,23-25 * column 3, lines 34-40 * * column 4, lines 8-31; figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP1076352 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [X] 1,3,5-8,10,16-18,21-23,25 * column 5, lines 1-15 * * column 6, lines 26-35; figures 1,4 * * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 15 * * column 13, line 27 - column 14, line 3 *; | [X]WO0177402 (SURFACE ENGINEERED PRODUCTS CO [CA], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6,8,10,11,16-18,21,25 * page 6, lines 8-15 * * page 7, lines 3-13 * * page 13, line 4 - page 14, line 21; figure 1; table 1 * * page 22, lines 10-20 * * page 23, lines 1,2,12,13 *; | [XAY]US2005061666 (GUPTA SUBHADRA [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8-10,16-20,22,24,25 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0015] , [0016] * * paragraphs [0021] , [0023] * * paragraphs [0130] - [0133] - [0135] , [0138]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0143] , [0150] , [0151] * [A] 13 [Y] 12,14,15; | [Y]US2005103620 (CHISTYAKOV ROMAN [US]) [Y] 12,14,15 * paragraph [0021] * * paragraphs [0023] - [0027]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0037]; figure 2A * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraphs [0062] , [0063]; figure 2D *; | [X]DE102005019100 (STEAG HAMATECH AG [DE]) [X] 1,8,10,12,16-18,22,25 * paragraph [0015] * * paragraphs [0025] , [0027] , [0028]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0034] , [0035] , [0041]; figures 2,3 * * paragraphs [0055] , [0057] * * paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0064] * | Opposition | DD217964 | US6093293 | US6217714 | DE10145201 | US6488824 | DE10213043 | US2004231973 | EP1626433 | WO2006063484 |