EP1925664 - Artificial binding proteins based on a modified alpha helical region of ubiquitin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scil Proteins GmbH Heinrich-Damerow-Strasse 1 06120 Halle/Saale / DE | [2008/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schräml, Michael, Dr. Carl-von-Ossietzky-Strasse 22 D-06114 Halle / DE | 02 /
Fiedler, Erik, Dr. Körnerstrasse 26 D-06114 Halle / DE | [2008/22] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichtstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06124137.8 | 15.11.2006 | [2008/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1925664 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/10, C07K14/47, G01N33/50 | [2008/22] | CPC: |
C07K14/00 (EP,US);
G01N33/6803 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2009/06] |
Former [2008/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Künstliche Bindungsproteine auf Grundlage einer modifizierten alpha-Helix Region von Ubiquitin | [2008/22] | English: | Artificial binding proteins based on a modified alpha helical region of ubiquitin | [2008/22] | French: | Protéines de liaison artificielles basées sur une région modifiée de type hélice alpha de l'ubiquitine | [2008/22] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/25] | 13.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]WO2004106368 (SCIL PROTEINS GMBH [DE], et al) [DX] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2005044845 (UNIV YALE [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2005059131 (UNIV YALE [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [X] - YEH E T H ET AL, "Ubiquitin-like proteins: new wines in new bottles", GENE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (200005), vol. 248, no. 1-2, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 1 - 14, XP004198791 [X] 1-18,28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-1119(00)00139-6 | [X] - ERMOLENKO DMITRI N ET AL, "Noncharged amino acid residues at the solvent-exposed positions in the middle and at the C terminus of the alpha-helix have the same helical propensity.", PROTEIN SCIENCE, (200306), vol. 12, no. 6, ISSN 0961-8368, pages 1169 - 1176, XP002437917 [X] 1-18,28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1110/ps.0304303 | [X] - KRANTZ B A ET AL, "Discerning the Structure and Energy of Multiple Transition States in Protein Folding using psi-Analysis", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (20040319), vol. 337, no. 2, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 463 - 475, XP004493197 [X] 1-32 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmb.2004.01.018 | [X] - BOFILL ET AL, "Engineering Stabilising beta-Sheet Interactions into a Conformationally Flexible Region of the Folding Transition State of Ubiquitin", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (20051021), vol. 353, no. 2, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 373 - 384, XP005086541 [X] 1-18,28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmb.2005.08.044 | [A] - YANG LORETTA ET AL, "Relationship between folding and function in a sequence-specific miniature DNA-binding protein.", BIOCHEMISTRY 24 MAY 2005, (20050524), vol. 44, no. 20, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 7469 - 7478, XP002437916 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi050121h | [A] - LOLADZE VAKHTANG V ET AL, "Both helical propensity and side-chain hydrophobicity at a partially exposed site in alpha-helix contribute to the thermodynamic stability of ubiquitin.", PROTEINS 1 JAN 2005, (20050101), vol. 58, no. 1, ISSN 1097-0134, pages 1 - 6, XP002437914 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/prot.20283 |