EP1923657 - A compact, fully stabilised, four axes, remote weapon station with independent line of sight [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 13.09.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAAB AB 581 88 Linköping / SE | [2008/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Svensson, Robert Ferievägen 11 177 60 Järfälla / SE | 02 /
Stalfors, Martin Torparmorsvägen 56 162 44 Vällingby / SE | [2008/21] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/18] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2014/45] | Zacco Sweden AB Valhallavägen 117 P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2009/41] | Norberg, Charlotte, et al Albihns AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2008/21] | Winblad, Hans Peter Albihns Stockholm AB Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 06124200.4 | 16.11.2006 | [2008/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1923657 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1923657 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F41G3/16, F41G3/22, F41G5/14 | [2008/21] | CPC: |
F41G3/165 (EP,US);
F41G3/22 (EP,US);
F41G5/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/18] |
Former [2008/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Eine kompakte und vollstabilisierte, mit vier Achsen ausgerüstete, Fernwaffestelle mit unabhängiger Visierlinie | [2008/21] | English: | A compact, fully stabilised, four axes, remote weapon station with independent line of sight | [2008/21] | French: | Une base d'arme éloignée compacte, intégralement stabilisée et équipée de quatre axes, avec ligne de visée indépendante | [2008/21] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/47] | 13.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2016 | Observations by third parties | 25.11.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.11.2017
ADMISSIBLE BAAINBw J3 Ferdinand-Sauerbruch-Strasse 1 56073 Koblenz / DE | [2017/51] | 16.01.2018 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 08.03.2018 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 10.04.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 18.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 03.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 13.06.2019 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2019/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.11.2006 | AT | 03.05.2017 | CY | 03.05.2017 | CZ | 03.05.2017 | DK | 03.05.2017 | EE | 03.05.2017 | ES | 03.05.2017 | FI | 03.05.2017 | IT | 03.05.2017 | LT | 03.05.2017 | LV | 03.05.2017 | MC | 03.05.2017 | NL | 03.05.2017 | PL | 03.05.2017 | PT | 03.05.2017 | RO | 03.05.2017 | SE | 03.05.2017 | SI | 03.05.2017 | SK | 03.05.2017 | TR | 03.05.2017 | BG | 03.08.2017 | GR | 04.08.2017 | IS | 03.09.2017 | GB | 16.11.2017 | IE | 16.11.2017 | LU | 16.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | CH | 30.11.2017 | FR | 30.11.2017 | LI | 30.11.2017 | DE | 02.06.2018 | [2022/26] |
Former [2020/22] | HU | 16.11.2006 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PT | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
GB | 16.11.2017 | ||
IE | 16.11.2017 | ||
LU | 16.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
DE | 02.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 16.11.2006 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
GB | 16.11.2017 | ||
IE | 16.11.2017 | ||
LU | 16.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
DE | 02.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 16.11.2006 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
GB | 16.11.2017 | ||
IE | 16.11.2017 | ||
LU | 16.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
DE | 02.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
GB | 16.11.2017 | ||
IE | 16.11.2017 | ||
LU | 16.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
DE | 02.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 16.11.2017 | ||
LU | 16.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
DE | 02.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 16.11.2017 | ||
LU | 16.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
DE | 02.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 16.11.2017 | ||
LU | 16.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
LU | 16.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR2484626 (APPLIC MACH MOTRICES [FR]) [X] 1 * page 4, line 1 - page 20, line 13; figures 1-11 * [A] 2-10; | [XA]EP0111192 (HOLLANDSE SIGNAALAPPARATEN BV [NL]) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 2, line 10 - page 8, line 12; figure . * [A] 2-10; | [AD]US4576346 (GAUGGEL ROLAND [DE], et al); | [A]EP0396822 (RHEINMETALL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 2, column 2, line 5 - page 3, column 4, line 15; figures 1-7 *; | [AD]US5273236 (WOOTTON JOHN R [US], et al); | [A]WO9928696 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 5, line 26 - page 13, line 14; figures 1-4 *; | [XA]WO0233342 (ELECTRO OPTIC SYSTEMS PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 11, line 6 - page 22, line 27; figures 1-4 * [A] 2-10; | [XA]US6499382 (LOUGHEED JAMES HUGH [CA], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 4, line 14 - column 10, line 7; figures 1-8 * [A] 2-10 | by applicant | EP0111192 | US4576346 | US5273236 | Opposition | - "PERI-R12", TDv 1240/050-40 (F), Geratebeschreibung, pages C1 - C15 |