EP1788712 - Radio receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/21] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimura, Yuji c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yoshino, Yoshitaka c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Mukai, Koichi c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Komori, Chisato c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2007/21] | Representative(s) | Melzer, Wolfgang Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/21] | Melzer, Wolfgang Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06124221.0 | 16.11.2006 | [2007/21] | Priority number, date | JP20050336477 | 22.11.2005 Original published format: JP 2005336477 | [2007/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1788712 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1788712 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/034, H04H40/18, H01Q1/24, H01Q1/46, // H04M1/05 | [2015/20] | CPC: |
H04H40/18 (EP,US);
H01Q1/242 (EP,US);
H01Q1/46 (EP,US);
H04B1/034 (EP,US);
H04M1/05 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/49] | H04B1/18, H04B1/16 | ||
Former IPC [2007/21] | H04B1/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2009/33] |
Former [2007/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Funkempfänger | [2007/21] | English: | Radio receiver | [2007/21] | French: | Récepteur radio | [2007/21] | Examination procedure | 14.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/26] | 04.06.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/08] | 06.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.06.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2360182 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-5 * page 4, line 35 - page 5, line 4 * * page 10, line 24 - page 12, line 15 * * page 6, line 21 - page 9, line 17 *; | [DX]JP2005064742 (SONY CORP) [DX] 6 * abstract * * paragraph [0038] * |