Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] |
19.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] |
04.07.2008 | (Expected) grant | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] |
21.06.2008 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
20.06.2008 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
20.06.2008 | New entry: Receipt of request for further processing | |
14.05.2008 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
04.01.2008 | Definitive list of designations | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] |
27.11.2007 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
07.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant | |
27.04.2007 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] |
27.04.2007 | Request for examination filed | published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] |