Designated contracting states | DE | | FR | | GB | | Examination procedure | 12.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | European patent granted | 06.08.2008 | Opposition procedure | 07.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.07.2009 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 30.05.2007 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20061121 | | Event date: | 30.05.2007 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 30.05.2007 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | AL BA HR MK YU | | Event date: | 06.02.2008 | | Event description: | DESIGNATION FEES PAID | Designated State(s): | DE FR GB | | Event date: | 06.08.2008 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | DE FR GB | | Event date: | 06.08.2008 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Event date: | 18.09.2008 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 602006002091 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20080918 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 15.07.2009 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20090507 | | Event date: | 30.01.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB 732E | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977) | Free Format Text: | REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130103 AND 20130109 | | Event date: | 06.02.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB 732E | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977) | Free Format Text: | REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130110 AND 20130116 | | Event date: | 16.04.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 602006002091 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | GULDE HENGELHAUPT ZIEBIG & SCHNEIDER, DE | | Event date: | 06.06.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 602006002091 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | GULDE HENGELHAUPT ZIEBIG & SCHNEIDER, DE | Effective DATE: | 20130416 | | Event date: | 06.06.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 602006002091 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO., LTD., KR | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: SAMSUNG MOBILE DISPLAY CO. LTD., SUWON, KR | Effective DATE: | 20130416 | | Event date: | 06.06.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 602006002091 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | GULDE & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWALTSKANZL, DE | Effective DATE: | 20130416 | | Event date: | 06.06.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 602006002091 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO., LTD., YONGIN-CITY, KR | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: SAMSUNG MOBILE DISPLAY CO. LTD., SUWON, GYEONGGI, KR | Effective DATE: | 20130416 | | Event date: | 26.10.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 10 | | Event date: | 25.10.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Event date: | 20.10.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 08.11.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 13 | | Event date: | 04.07.2008 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 20.06.2008 | | Event description: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Event date: | 27.11.2007 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 27.04.2007 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 12.06.2009 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Event date: | 12.06.2009 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | | Event date: | 21.06.2023 | | Event description: | OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) REGISTERED | Effective DATE: | 20230515 | | Event date: | 18.01.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20231023 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 31.01.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20231023 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 31.01.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20231024 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | |