EP1813143 - Display unit of drive specific status information on an agricultural motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH Mühlenwinkel 1 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | [2016/48] |
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH Münsterstrasse 33 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hugenroth, Ludger Loburg 28 48346 Ostbevern / DE | 02 /
Twiefel, Herbert Habichtweg 1 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | 03 /
Isfort, Heinrich Rödder 22 48249 Dülmen / DE | [2007/31] | Application number, filing date | 06124458.8 | 21.11.2006 | [2007/31] | Priority number, date | DE20061004717 | 31.01.2006 Original published format: DE102006004717 | [2007/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1813143 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1813143 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A01D41/127, G07C5/08 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
A01D41/127 (EP);
G07C5/0825 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/14] |
Former [2007/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Anzeigeeinheit antriebsspezifischer Zustandsinformationen auf einem landwirtschaftlich nutzbaren Motorfahrzeug | [2007/31] | English: | Display unit of drive specific status information on an agricultural motor vehicle | [2007/31] | French: | Unité de signalisation d'informations d'état spécifiques à l'entraînement sur un véhicule à moteur utilitaire agricole | [2007/31] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 07.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.11.2006 | CY | 05.04.2017 | CZ | 05.04.2017 | DK | 05.04.2017 | EE | 05.04.2017 | ES | 05.04.2017 | FI | 05.04.2017 | IT | 05.04.2017 | LT | 05.04.2017 | LV | 05.04.2017 | MC | 05.04.2017 | NL | 05.04.2017 | PL | 05.04.2017 | PT | 05.04.2017 | RO | 05.04.2017 | SE | 05.04.2017 | SI | 05.04.2017 | SK | 05.04.2017 | TR | 05.04.2017 | BG | 05.07.2017 | GR | 06.07.2017 | IS | 05.08.2017 | AT | 21.11.2017 | GB | 21.11.2017 | IE | 21.11.2017 | LU | 21.11.2017 | CH | 30.11.2017 | FR | 30.11.2017 | LI | 30.11.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 21.11.2006 | |
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
AT | 21.11.2017 | ||
GB | 21.11.2017 | ||
IE | 21.11.2017 | ||
LU | 21.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 21.11.2006 | |
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
AT | 21.11.2017 | ||
GB | 21.11.2017 | ||
IE | 21.11.2017 | ||
LU | 21.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 21.11.2006 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
AT | 21.11.2017 | ||
GB | 21.11.2017 | ||
IE | 21.11.2017 | ||
LU | 21.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
AT | 21.11.2017 | ||
GB | 21.11.2017 | ||
IE | 21.11.2017 | ||
LU | 21.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CZ | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
GB | 21.11.2017 | ||
IE | 21.11.2017 | ||
LU | 21.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CZ | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 21.11.2017 | ||
LU | 21.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CZ | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 21.11.2017 | ||
LU | 21.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/41] | CZ | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 21.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | CZ | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | CZ | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | DK | 05.04.2017 | |
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 05.04.2017 | |
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 05.04.2017 | |
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 05.04.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5978720 (HIERONYMUS PETER [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 2, line 9 - column 8, line 4; figure - *; | [X]US2006020402 (BISCHOFF LUTZ [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0020] - [0023] - [0029]; figure - *; | [X]US2002107625 (BECK FOLKER [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0023] - [0025]; figure - *; | [X]GB2320328 (CATERPILLAR INC [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 13, line 8 - page 14, line 28; figure - *; | [E]US2006276949 (BECK FOLKER [DE], et al) [E] 1-10 * paragraphs [0025] , [0027] , [0037]; figure - * | by applicant | DE1780052 | DE3049055 |