EP1813645 - pvc-composition and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Benecke-Kaliko AG Beneckeallee 40 30419 Hannover / DE | [2007/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buchkremer, Karl Dr. Danzigerstr. 6 30938, Burgwedel / DE | [2007/31] | Representative(s) | Finger, Karsten Continental Aktiengesellschaft Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 169 30001 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | Finger, Karsten Continental Aktiengesellschaft Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 169 30001 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 06124701.1 | 24.11.2006 | [2007/31] | Priority number, date | DE20061003913 | 27.01.2006 Original published format: DE102006003913 | [2007/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1813645 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1813645 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/11, C08L27/06 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
C08K5/11 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/11, C08L27/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/31] | Title | German: | PVC-Zusammensetzung und deren Verwendung | [2007/31] | English: | pvc-composition and use thereof | [2007/31] | French: | composition à base de pvc et son utilisation | [2007/31] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 28.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.09.2008 | CZ | 17.09.2008 | DK | 17.09.2008 | EE | 17.09.2008 | FI | 17.09.2008 | IE | 17.09.2008 | LT | 17.09.2008 | LV | 17.09.2008 | NL | 17.09.2008 | PL | 17.09.2008 | RO | 17.09.2008 | SI | 17.09.2008 | SK | 17.09.2008 | TR | 17.09.2008 | BE | 30.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | BG | 17.12.2008 | SE | 17.12.2008 | GR | 18.12.2008 | ES | 28.12.2008 | IS | 17.01.2009 | PT | 17.02.2009 | HU | 18.03.2009 | [2011/03] |
Former [2010/41] | CY | 17.09.2008 | |
CZ | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
IE | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
LV | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
PL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
TR | 17.09.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
SE | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
HU | 18.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/26] | CZ | 17.09.2008 | |
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
IE | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
LV | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
PL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
SE | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | CZ | 17.09.2008 | |
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
IE | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
LV | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
SE | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/02] | CZ | 17.09.2008 | |
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
EE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
IE | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
LV | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 17.09.2008 | |
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
LV | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/28] | CZ | 17.09.2008 | |
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
LV | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
RO | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
SK | 17.09.2008 | ||
BG | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
IS | 17.01.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | FI | 17.09.2008 | |
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
LV | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | FI | 17.09.2008 | |
LT | 17.09.2008 | ||
LV | 17.09.2008 | ||
SI | 17.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 17.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP1063257 (ERA BESCHICHTUNG GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [DA] 1-12* the whole document * |