EP1793011 - Process for forming thermal barrier coating resistant to infiltration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2018 | Opposition rejected | published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2015/09] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [2007/23] | For all designated states General Electric Company One River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gorman, Mark Daniel 7272 Overland Park Court West Chester, OH 45069 / US | 02 /
Nagaraj, Bangalore Aswatha 5196 Travers Court West Chester, OH 45069 / US | 03 /
Schafrik, Robert Edward 9918 Pheasantwalk Court Cincinnati, OH 45241 / US | [2007/23] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth, et al Global Patent Operations Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/09] | Szary, Anne Catherine GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/38] | Bedford, Grant Richard GE London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2007/23] | Bedford, Grant Richard London Patent Operation GE International Inc 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06124714.4 | 24.11.2006 | [2007/23] | Priority number, date | US20050164615 | 30.11.2005 Original published format: US 164615 | [2007/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1793011 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1793011 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | [2007/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1793011 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C23C4/18, C23C28/00, F01D5/28 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
C23C4/18 (EP,US);
C23C28/321 (EP,US);
C23C28/3215 (EP,US);
C23C28/325 (EP,US);
C23C28/345 (EP,US);
C23C28/3455 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/21] |
Former [2007/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer infiltrationsresistenten Wärmedämmschicht | [2007/23] | English: | Process for forming thermal barrier coating resistant to infiltration | [2007/23] | French: | Procédé de formation d'un revêtement de barrière thermique résistant à l'infiltration | [2007/23] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 13.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 07.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.04.2008 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.08.2015
23.08.2016
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE Opponent's representative Kaiser, Axel Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2017/50] |
Former [2015/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.08.2015
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE Opponent's representative Kaiser, Axel Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | 13.01.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.11.2017 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2018/17] | 07.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.12.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.12.2017 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 24.11.2016 | FR | 30.11.2016 | DE | 01.06.2017 | [2018/01] |
Former [2017/50] | FR | 30.11.2016 | |
DE | 01.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]US5660885 (HASZ WAYNE CHARLES [US], et al) [DY] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2005095665 (COUNCIL SCIENT IND RES [IN], et al) [Y] 1-9 * page 1, line 23 - line 27; examples 1-10; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP1587348 (UNIV FENG CHIA [TW]) [Y] 10 * claims 1,2,7,10 *; | [A]US6756082 (SUBRAMANIAN RAMESH [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1428902 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |