EP1803363 - Inner boot, particularly for a sports shoe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROCES S.r.l. Via G. Ferraris 36 I-31044 Montebelluna (Treviso) / IT | [2007/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cavasin, Massimo Via Cima Mandria, 1-M 31044, Montebelluna TV / IT | [2007/27] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/27] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 06124967.8 | 29.11.2006 | [2007/27] | Priority number, date | IT2005TV00203 | 29.12.2005 Original published format: IT TV20050203 | [2007/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1803363 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1803363 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | [2007/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1803363 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A43B5/16, A43B5/04 | [2007/27] | CPC: |
A43B5/1608 (EP,US);
A43B1/0018 (EP,US);
A43B5/0405 (EP,US);
A43B5/0435 (EP,US);
A43B5/1658 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/27] | Title | German: | Innenschuh, insbesondere für Sportschuh | [2007/27] | English: | Inner boot, particularly for a sports shoe | [2007/27] | French: | Chausson intérieur, en particulier pour chaussure de sport | [2007/27] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/10] | 22.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 20.05.2009 | CY | 20.05.2009 | DK | 20.05.2009 | EE | 20.05.2009 | FI | 20.05.2009 | LT | 20.05.2009 | LV | 20.05.2009 | NL | 20.05.2009 | PL | 20.05.2009 | RO | 20.05.2009 | SK | 20.05.2009 | TR | 20.05.2009 | BG | 20.08.2009 | GR | 21.08.2009 | ES | 31.08.2009 | IS | 20.09.2009 | PT | 20.09.2009 | IE | 29.11.2009 | LU | 29.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/22] | BE | 20.05.2009 | |
DK | 20.05.2009 | ||
EE | 20.05.2009 | ||
FI | 20.05.2009 | ||
LT | 20.05.2009 | ||
LV | 20.05.2009 | ||
NL | 20.05.2009 | ||
PL | 20.05.2009 | ||
RO | 20.05.2009 | ||
SK | 20.05.2009 | ||
BG | 20.08.2009 | ||
GR | 21.08.2009 | ||
ES | 31.08.2009 | ||
IS | 20.09.2009 | ||
PT | 20.09.2009 | ||
IE | 29.11.2009 | ||
LU | 29.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | BE | 20.05.2009 | |
DK | 20.05.2009 | ||
EE | 20.05.2009 | ||
FI | 20.05.2009 | ||
LT | 20.05.2009 | ||
LV | 20.05.2009 | ||
NL | 20.05.2009 | ||
PL | 20.05.2009 | ||
RO | 20.05.2009 | ||
SK | 20.05.2009 | ||
BG | 20.08.2009 | ||
GR | 21.08.2009 | ||
ES | 31.08.2009 | ||
IS | 20.09.2009 | ||
PT | 20.09.2009 | ||
IE | 29.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | BE | 20.05.2009 | |
DK | 20.05.2009 | ||
EE | 20.05.2009 | ||
FI | 20.05.2009 | ||
LT | 20.05.2009 | ||
LV | 20.05.2009 | ||
NL | 20.05.2009 | ||
PL | 20.05.2009 | ||
RO | 20.05.2009 | ||
SK | 20.05.2009 | ||
BG | 20.08.2009 | ||
ES | 31.08.2009 | ||
IS | 20.09.2009 | ||
PT | 20.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | BE | 20.05.2009 | |
DK | 20.05.2009 | ||
EE | 20.05.2009 | ||
FI | 20.05.2009 | ||
LT | 20.05.2009 | ||
LV | 20.05.2009 | ||
NL | 20.05.2009 | ||
PL | 20.05.2009 | ||
RO | 20.05.2009 | ||
SK | 20.05.2009 | ||
BG | 20.08.2009 | ||
ES | 31.08.2009 | ||
IS | 20.09.2009 | ||
PT | 20.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | BE | 20.05.2009 | |
DK | 20.05.2009 | ||
EE | 20.05.2009 | ||
FI | 20.05.2009 | ||
LT | 20.05.2009 | ||
LV | 20.05.2009 | ||
NL | 20.05.2009 | ||
PL | 20.05.2009 | ||
RO | 20.05.2009 | ||
SK | 20.05.2009 | ||
ES | 31.08.2009 | ||
IS | 20.09.2009 | ||
PT | 20.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/02] | FI | 20.05.2009 | |
LT | 20.05.2009 | ||
LV | 20.05.2009 | ||
NL | 20.05.2009 | ||
PL | 20.05.2009 | ||
ES | 31.08.2009 | ||
IS | 20.09.2009 | ||
PT | 20.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB690660 (WERNER ALBERT FORSTER) [X] 9 * page 2; figure - * [A] 1; | [A]FR2358117 (MITCHELL SA [FR]) [A] 1,9 * page 5, lines 1-11; figures 5,6 *; | [XA]US4268931 (SALOMON GEORGES P J) [X] 1,2 * column 5, lines 1-3; figures 5-9 * [A] 9; | [XA]EP0308368 (LANGE INT SA [CH]) [X] 1,6 * column 3, lines 29-37; figure - * [A] 9; | [A]WO9806286 (MOD 8 [FR], et al) [A] 1,9* page 5, lines 13-18; figure 6 *; | [A]US2001005948 (PELLEGRINI ALFRED [IT], et al) [A] 1,9 * figure 4 * |