EP1809084 - Electrical device with interface modul [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/29] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Volker In den Neumorgen 14 67483 Edesheim / DE | 02 /
Baumann, Alexander Lindwurmstr. 5a 80337 München / DE | [2011/44] |
Former [2007/29] | 01 /
Müller, Volker In den Neumorgen 14 67483, Edesheim / DE | ||
02 /
Baumann, Alexander Lindwurmstr. 5a 80337, München / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/11] | Application number, filing date | 06125572.5 | 07.12.2006 | [2007/29] | Priority number, date | DE20061001501 | 11.01.2006 Original published format: DE102006001501 | [2007/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1809084 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1809084 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H05K5/00, H01R31/06, H01R13/635 | [2007/29] | CPC: |
H01R31/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, SE [2008/13] |
Former [2007/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrisches Gerät mit Schnittstellenmodul | [2007/29] | English: | Electrical device with interface modul | [2007/29] | French: | Appareil électrique avec module d'interface | [2007/29] | Examination procedure | 22.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/41] | 20.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 10.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2007 | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR2591056 (CAPPAGLI GERARD [FR]) [X] 1,4-6 * page 1, line 23 - page 2, line 37 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 2,3; | [XA]EP0657834 (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1,4-6 * column 3, line 48 - column 5, line 48 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 2,3; | [X]US6597924 (SMITH RONALD L [US]) [X] 6 * claim 1 * * figures 7-16 * |