EP1930048 - Method and device for regulated feeding of supply air [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2012 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amrona AG Untermüli 7 6302 Zug / CH | [2008/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | 02 /
* * * | 03 /
* * * | [2011/41] |
Former [2008/24] | 01 /
* * * | ||
02 /
* * * | |||
03 /
* * * | Representative(s) | Rupprecht, Kay Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/05] | Rupprecht, Kay Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 47-50 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/24] | Rupprecht, Kay Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06125707.7 | 08.12.2006 | [2008/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1930048 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1930048 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A62C99/00 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
A62C99/0018 (EP,US);
A62C99/00 (KR);
A62C3/16 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2008/24] | A62C39/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum geregelten Zuführen von Zuluft | [2008/24] | English: | Method and device for regulated feeding of supply air | [2008/24] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de réglage d'alimentation de l'air d'admission | [2008/24] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2006 | Examination requested [2008/24] | 04.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 01.02.2012 | EE | 01.02.2012 | GR | 01.02.2012 | LT | 01.02.2012 | LV | 01.02.2012 | RO | 01.02.2012 | BG | 01.05.2012 | IS | 01.06.2012 | PT | 01.06.2012 | [2014/38] |
Former [2013/33] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | LT | 01.02.2012 | |
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | LT | 01.02.2012 | |
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 01.02.2012 | |
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 01.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5887439 (KOTLIAR IGOR K [US]) [A] 11-13,24,26,27 * column 4, lines 4-55 * * column 5, line 5 - column 6, line 46; figures 2-4 *; | [A]WO0178843 (KOTLIAR IGOR K [US]) [A] * page 18, lines 1-23 * * page 21, lines 1-16 ** page 21, lines 20,21; figure 4; claims 5,10-12 *; | [X]EP1312392 (WAGNER ALARM SICHERUNG [DE]) [X] 1,14,16 * column 3, lines 23-36; figure 2 *; | [A]US2003226669 (WAGNER ERNST WERNER [DE]) [A] 6,17,25 * paragraph [0042] *; | [A]EP1475128 (VESTA SRL [IT]) [A] 3-5,7,9,10,18,19 * paragraph [0017] * * paragraphs [0046] , [0047] * * paragraphs [0068] , [0069]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP1683548 (AMRONA AG [CH]) [X] 1,14 * paragraphs [0020] , [0021]; figure 1 *; | [XA]US2006213673 (KOTLIAR IGOR K [US]) [X] 1,14-16 * paragraphs [0020] - [0023] * * paragraphs [0026] , [0035] , [0041]; figures 1,3 * [A] 2,8,20-23 |