blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1932531

EP1932531 - Special extract and its use to inhibit the decomposition of cyclical guanosinmonophosphate (cGMP) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.12.2009
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.03.2010Change - representativepublished on 14.04.2010  [2010/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Finzelberg GmbH & Co. KG
Koblenzer Strasse 48-56
56626 Andernach / DE
[2008/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Feistel, Björn
Im Boden 32
56626 Andernach / DE
02 / Kreuter, Matthias Heinrich
Neudörflistrasse 1
56626 Andernach / CH
 [2008/25]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/15]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2009/31]Schreiber, Christoph
Patentanwälte Von Kreisler Selting Werner Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Former [2008/25]Schreiber, Christoph
von Kreisler Selting Werner, Postfach 10 22 41
50463 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date06125821.611.12.2006
[2008/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1932531
Date:18.06.2008
Language:DE
[2008/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.07.2007
ClassificationIPC:A61K36/185, A61P15/10
[2008/25]
CPC:
A61K36/185 (EP,US); A61P15/00 (EP); A61P15/10 (EP)
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2009/09]
Former [2008/25]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Spezialextrakt und seine Verwendung zur Hemmung des Abbaus von cyclischem Guanosinmonophosphat (cGMP)[2008/25]
English:Special extract and its use to inhibit the decomposition of cyclical guanosinmonophosphate (cGMP)[2008/25]
French:Extrait spécifique et son utilisation pour atténuer la perte de Guanosine monophosphate (cGMP) cyclique[2008/25]
Examination procedure19.12.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/02]
27.01.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2010/02]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200803   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]WO03094943  (INDENA SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 2, line 22 - page 3, line 12 * * page 5, line 9 - line 15 *
 [X]  - THARAKAN BINU ET AL, "Botanical therapies in sexual dysfunction", PHYTOTHERAPY RESEARCH, (200506), vol. 19, no. 6, ISSN 0951-418X, pages 457 - 463, XP002438019 [X] 1-12,15 * page 457, column 1, line 19 - line 21 * * page 458, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 461, column 2, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ptr.1634
 [X]  - ARLETTI R ET AL, "Stimulating property of Turnera diffusa and Pfaffia paniculata extracts on the sexual behavior of male rats", PSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY, (199903), vol. 143, no. 1, ISSN 0033-3158, pages 15 - 19, XP002438020 [X] 1-12,15 * page 15, column 2, line 18 - line 22 * * page 16, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 17, column 1, line 4 - page 18, column 1, line 15 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s002130050913
 [A]  - ALARCON-AGUILAR F J ET AL, "INVESTIGATION ON THE HYPOGLYCAEMIC EFFECTS OF EXTRACTS OF FOUR MEXICAN MEDICINAL PLANTS IN NORMAL AND ALLOXAN-DIABETIC MICE", PHYTOTHERAPY RESEARCH, JOHN WILEY & SONS LTD. CHICHESTER, GB, (200206), vol. 16, no. 4, ISSN 0951-418X, pages 383 - 386, XP008080184 [A] 1-10 * page 383, column 2, paragraph 4 - page 384, column 1, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ptr.914
 [A]  - ANTONIO M A ET AL, "Oral anti-inflammatory and anti-ulcerogenic activities of a hydroalcoholic extract and partitioned fractions of Turnera ulmifolia (Turneraceae)", JOURNAL OF ETHNOPHARMACOLOGY, (199807), vol. 61, no. 3, ISSN 0378-8741, pages 215 - 228, XP002439812 [A] 1-10 * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-8741(98)00049-X
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.