EP1798498 - Vapor compression refrigerating systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanden Corporation 20 Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma 372-8502 / JP | [2007/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsumoto, Yuuichi c/o Sanden Corporation 20, Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma 372-8502 / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Kenichi c/o Sanden Corporation 20, Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma 372-8502 / JP | 03 /
Tsuboi, Masato c/o Sanden Corporation 20, Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma 372-8502 / JP | [2007/25] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/25] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06125926.3 | 12.12.2006 | [2007/25] | Priority number, date | JP20050358659 | 13.12.2005 Original published format: JP 2005358659 | [2007/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1798498 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1798498 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F25B9/00 | [2007/25] | CPC: |
F25B9/008 (EP,US);
F25B41/00 (EP,US);
F25B9/06 (EP,US);
F25B2309/061 (EP,US);
F25B2400/23 (EP,US);
F25B2600/2501 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/12] |
Former [2007/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dampfkompressionssystem | [2007/25] | English: | Vapor compression refrigerating systems | [2007/25] | French: | Système de refrigération par compression de vapeur | [2007/25] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/27] | 17.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE10001470 (KARSCH MAX [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,10-12 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 59; figures 2,3,5-7,11 *; | [A]DE10358428 (GRASSO GMBH REFRIGERATION TECH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [XY]EP0260367 (KNOCHE GES FUR KALTE UND KLIMA [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,11,12 * column 2, line 5 - column 4, line 54; figures 1-3 * [Y] 13-22; | [Y]DE2806729 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG) [Y] 13-22 * page 5, paragraph 3; figure 1 *; | [Y]JP2003121018 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [Y] 14,15 * abstract *; | [Y]DE19702097 (NIPPON SOKEN [JP]) [Y] 7-9,16-18 * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 6; figures 1,8,12 * | [XY] - HAFNER A, "COMPACT HEAT EXCHANGERS FOR MOBILE CO2 SYSTEMS", IIR GUSTAV LORENTZEN CONFERENCE ON NATURAL WORKING FLUIDS. JOINT CONFERENCE OF THE INTERNATIONAL INSTITUTE OF REFRIGERATION SECTION B AND E, XX, XX, (20020917), pages 224 - 231, XP001176587 [X] 1-6,10-12 * figure 2.1 * [Y] 7-9 | [X] - SCHIESARO P ET AL, "DEVELOPMENT OF A TWO STAGE CO2 SUPERMARKET SYSTEM", IIR CONFERENCE. NEW TECHNOLOGIES IN COMMERCIAL REFRIGERATION, XX, XX, (20020722), pages 1 - 10, XP001169091 [X] 1-6,10-12 * paragraph [03.1]; figure 1 * |