EP1798406 - Fuel injection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissan Motor Company Limited 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [2007/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHGA, Kiyoshi, Nissan Technical Centre c/o Intellectual Property Dept, 560-2 Okatsukoku Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0192 / JP | [2007/25] | Representative(s) | Brochard, Pascale, et al Osha Liang 32 Avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Brochard, Pascale, et al Osha Liang 32 avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/25] | Holmes, Matthew William, et al Nissan Motor Manufacturing (UK) Ltd Intellectual Property Department Nissan Technical Centre Europe Cranfield Technology Park Cranfield, Bedfordshire MK43 0DB / GB | Application number, filing date | 06125977.6 | 12.12.2006 | [2007/25] | Priority number, date | JP20050358684 | 13.12.2005 Original published format: JP 2005358684 | JP20060237584 | 01.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006237584 | [2007/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1798406 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/40, // F02D41/14 | [2007/25] | CPC: |
F02D41/402 (EP,US);
F02D41/1467 (EP,US);
F02D41/1446 (EP,US);
F02D41/1459 (EP,US);
F02D41/146 (EP,US);
F02D41/403 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kraftstoffeinspritzung | [2007/25] | English: | Fuel injection | [2007/25] | French: | Injection de carburant | [2007/25] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/04] | 27.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |