EP1798448 - Transport and Mounting Protection Device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GM Global Technology Operations, Inc. 300 Renaissance Center Detroit, MI 48265-3000 / US | [2007/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Englund, Fredrik Nordewallsgatan 36 S-461 39 Trollhättan / SE | [2007/25] | Representative(s) | Strauss, Peter Adam Opel AG Patentrecht, A0-02 65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | Strauss, Peter Adam Opel GmbH Patentrecht, A0-02 65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | ||
Former [2007/25] | Lind, Urban Arvid Oskar AWAPATENT AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 06126128.5 | 14.12.2006 | [2007/25] | Priority number, date | SE20050002816 | 16.12.2005 Original published format: SE 0502816 | [2007/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1798448 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1798448 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16H57/02 | [2007/25] | CPC: |
F16J15/3268 (EP,US);
F16H57/00 (SE);
F16H48/08 (EP,US);
F16H2048/382 (EP,US);
F16H2057/0093 (EP,US);
F16H48/40 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2186 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/25] | Title | German: | Transport- und Montageschutzvorrichtung | [2007/25] | English: | Transport and Mounting Protection Device | [2007/25] | French: | Dispositif de protection de tranport et de montage | [2007/25] | Examination procedure | 05.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 31.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.02.2009 | BE | 25.02.2009 | CY | 25.02.2009 | CZ | 25.02.2009 | DK | 25.02.2009 | EE | 25.02.2009 | FI | 25.02.2009 | IT | 25.02.2009 | LT | 25.02.2009 | LV | 25.02.2009 | NL | 25.02.2009 | PL | 25.02.2009 | RO | 25.02.2009 | SI | 25.02.2009 | SK | 25.02.2009 | TR | 25.02.2009 | BG | 25.05.2009 | SE | 25.05.2009 | GR | 26.05.2009 | ES | 05.06.2009 | IS | 25.06.2009 | PT | 12.08.2009 | HU | 26.08.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
HU | 26.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/02] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06341513 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO); | [A]JPH07286657 (HINO MOTORS LTD); | [A]JP2003166625 (JATCO LTD); | [A]US2004182198 (MARICH RANDALL M [US]); | [A]US2005188784 (KNOX THOMAS P [DE], et al) | by applicant | US2005188784 |