01.09.2017 |
Withdrawal of application |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
28.06.2017 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.03.2017 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
08.03.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.02.2017 |
First examination report |
|
10.01.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.12.2016 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
09.12.2016 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 11.01.2017 [2017/02] |
18.11.2016 |
Change - designated states |
published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
04.11.2016 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
04.11.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
04.11.2016 |
Change - designated states |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
28.10.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.04.2016 |
Publication of search report |
published on 04.05.2016 [2016/18] |
01.04.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.05.2016 [2016/18] |
11.01.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.10.2015 |
Change - applicant |
published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] |
05.04.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
24.12.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.12.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.12.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.12.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.01.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.02.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] |
07.12.2007 |
Change - representative |
published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] |
31.08.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.10.2007 [2007/40] |