EP1825972 - Cutting device of an apparatus for producing synthetic caps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.05.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Capuzzi System S.r.l. Via Tito Baresani, 5 25010 Brescia / IT | [2007/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAPUZZI, Claudio Traversa XVIII^, 59 Villaggio Sereno 25125, Brescia / IT | [2007/35] | Representative(s) | Crippa, Paolo Ernesto Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria 11 25122 Brescia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Crippa, Paolo Ernesto Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria 11 25122 Brescia / IT | ||
Former [2007/35] | Crippa, Paolo Ernesto Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria, 11 25122 Brescia / IT | Application number, filing date | 06126294.5 | 18.12.2006 | [2007/35] | Priority number, date | WO2006IT00105 | 24.02.2006 Original published format: PCT/IT2006/000105 | [2007/35] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1825972 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1825972 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | [2007/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B26D1/28, B26D5/32, B26D7/06 | [2007/35] | CPC: |
B26D1/28 (EP);
B26D5/32 (EP);
B26D7/06 (EP);
B26D7/0666 (EP);
B26D2007/013 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/35] | Title | German: | Scheidvorrichtung einer Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Kunststoffverschlussen | [2007/42] | English: | Cutting device of an apparatus for producing synthetic caps | [2007/35] | French: | Dispositif de coupe dýun appareil de production de bouchons synthétiques | [2007/42] |
Former [2007/35] | Scheidvorrichtung einer Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Kunststoffverschlüssen | ||
Former [2007/35] | Dispositif de coupe d'un appareil de production de bouchons synthétiques | Examination procedure | 15.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/22] | 22.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/23] | 13.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR1276772 (GARRET) [X] 1-12,22,24,25 * page 2, column L, paragraph 9 - column R, paragraph 2; figure - * [Y] 13-15; | [DXY]IT1326870 (GASPARRI PAOLO [IT]) [DX] 1,28-30 * page 7, line 3 - line 4; figure - * [Y] 31,32; | [X]US4192207 (BICKFORD DAVID E [US], et al) [X] 1,8,16,17,19 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 40; figure 3 *; | [Y]DE8322171U (ALPMA ALPENLAND MASCHINENBAU HAIN & CO KG, 8093 ROTT, DE) [Y] 13-15 * figure - *; | [Y]DE552629 (BERKEL PATENT NV) [Y] 13-15 * page 1, line 25 - line 33; figure - *; | [X]FR2673879 (FAIREX [FR]) [X] 1,23 * abstract *; | [XY]GB904755 (REIFENHAUSER GMBH) [X] 1,23,26,27 * page 1, line 30 - line 60; figure - * [Y] 31,32 |