EP1935971 - Partial acyl glyceride based biowaxes, biocandles prepared therefrom and their preparation methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/26] | Partial acyl glyceride based biowaxes, biocandles prepared therfrom and their preparation methods | ||
[2008/40] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chant Oil Co., Ltd. No. 29-1, Lane 249, Section 2 Chung-Shan Road Shu-Lin City Taipei Hsien / TW | [2008/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Yi-Fa 29-1, Lane 249, Section 2 Chung-Shan Road Shu-Lin TAIPEI Hsien / TW | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | Collin, Jérôme Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/26] | Collin, Jérôme Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06126298.6 | 18.12.2006 | [2008/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1935971 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C11C5/02, C11C3/02 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
C11C5/002 (EP);
C11C3/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/26] | Title | German: | Teilweise Acylglycerid basierte Biowachse, daraus hergestellte Biokerzen und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [2008/26] | English: | Partial acyl glyceride based biowaxes, biocandles prepared therefrom and their preparation methods | [2008/40] | French: | Cires biologiques à base de glycéride acyle partiel, bougies biologiques préparées à partir de celles-ci et leurs procédés de préparation | [2008/26] |
Former [2008/26] | Partial acyl glyceride based biowaxes, biocandles prepared therfrom and their preparation methods | Examination procedure | 18.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 15.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/49] | 09.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.04.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3012047 (WOODS GEORGE E) [X] 1-6,9,10 * examples 1-3 *; | [X]US3844706 (TSARAS E) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0041204 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-4,7,9,10 * example 1 *; | [X]EP0191217 (AMANO PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,9,10 * examples 5-7 *; | [X]US2003057599 (MURPHY TIMOTHY A [US], et al) [X] 1-13* the whole document *; | [X]US2004088907 (MURPHY TIMOTHY A [US]) [X] 1,4,7,9-12 * paragraphs [0040] , [0056] - [0061] *; | [X]US2004088908 (MURPHY TIMOTHY A [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6-13 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1693436 (CARGILL INC [US]) [X] 1-4,7,9-11 * paragraphs [0016] , [0034]; claims 1,7,11,14 *; | [X] - MCNEILL G P ET AL, SELECTIVE DISTRIBUTION OF SATURATED FATTY ACIDS INTO THE MONOGLYCERIDE FRACTION DURING ENZYMATIC GLYCEROLYSIS, JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS' SOCIETY, AOCS PRESS, CHAMPAIGN, IL, US, PAGE(S) 1098-1103, (19921101), ISSN 0003-021X, XP000324893 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02541043 | [X] - GUIMARAES AGUIAR, L.M., AND MATHEUS VARGAS, R., "Preparation of monoglycerides by guanidine-catalyzed processes", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS' SOCIETY., USAMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS' SOCIETY. CHAMPAIGN., (1998), vol. 75, no. 6, pages 755 - 756, XP002432189 [X] 1-4,9,10 * page 755, column 2 - page 756, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11746-998-0221-6 | Examination | EP0445692 | WO0211543 | EP1281750 | WO2004052115 |