EP1801564 - Apparatus and method for providing light to channels or portions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/26] | Providing light to channels or portions | ||
[2018/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Palo Alto Research Center Incorporated 3333 Coyote Hill Road Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | [2007/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Oliver 4294 - C Wilkie Way Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 02 /
Mohta, Setu No. 502, Tower 6, The Palms South City-Phase 1 Gurgaon Haryana 12201 / IN | 03 /
Kiesel, Peter 3795 El Centro Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2018/25] |
Former [2007/26] | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06126528.6 | 19.12.2006 | [2007/26] | Priority number, date | US20050316660 | 22.12.2005 Original published format: US 316660 | [2007/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1801564 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1801564 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/05, G01N33/543, G01N21/03, G01N21/64, G01N21/65, B01L3/00 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
G01N21/05 (EP,US);
B01L3/502715 (EP,US);
G01N21/0303 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0654 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0816 (EP,US);
B01L2300/168 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/26] | G01N21/05, B01L3/00, G01N33/543 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2018/25] |
Former [2008/10] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Beleuchtung von Kanälen oder Teilbereichen | [2018/04] | English: | Apparatus and method for providing light to channels or portions | [2018/04] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour la fourniture de lumière aux canaux ou portions | [2018/04] |
Former [2007/26] | Bereitstellung von Licht für Kanäle oder Teilbereiche | ||
Former [2007/26] | Providing light to channels or portions | ||
Former [2007/26] | Fourniture de lumière aux canaux ou portions | Examination procedure | 27.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/07] | 28.12.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0062050 (UNIV MANCHESTER [GB], et al) [X] 1-9 * page 6, line 6 - page 10, line 2; figures 1-6 * * page 15, line 30 - page 19, line L *; | [X]US6490034 (WOIAS PETER [DE], et al) [X] 10-13 * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line L; figures 8-10 *; | [A]EP0679881 (HEWLETT PACKARD GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * page 3, line 12 - page 4, line 43; figures 1,3,4 * | [A] - SINGH K ET AL, "Analysis of cellular structure by light scattering measurements in a new cytometer design based on a liquid-core waveguide", IEE PROC.-NANOBIOTECHNOL., (20040205), vol. 151, no. 1, pages 10 - 16, XP006021506 [A] 1-13 * page 10, column 2, paragraph L - page 12, column 1, line 21; figures 2-6 * | Examination | US3797911 | by applicant | US6580507 | US6490034 | - GODDARD, N.J.; SINGH, K.; BOUNAIRA, F.; HOLMES, R.J.; BALDOCK, S.J.; PICKERING, L.W.; FIELDEN, P.R.; SNOOK, R.D., ANTI-RESONANT REFLECTING OPTICAL WAVEGUIDES (ARROWS) AS OPTIMAL OPTICAL DETECTORS FOR MICROTAS APPLICATIONS, pages 1 - 5, URL: dias.umist.ac.uk/NJG/Abstracts/MicroTAS/MicroTas2.htm |