EP1935636 - Laminate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 18.12.2015 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Selig Sealing Products, Inc. 342 East Wabash Street Forrest, IL 61741 / US | [2011/16] |
Former [2011/09] | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works, Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US | ||
Former [2008/26] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview Illinois 60025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sachs, Victor 106 The Woodfields Sanderstead Surrey, CR2 0HF / GB | 02 /
Thornhill, Craig Warren 6 Glenmore Close Thatcham Berkshire, RG19 3XR / GB | 03 /
McLean, Andrew Fenwick 12 Sadlers, Badgers Copse Tilehurst, Reading Berkshire, RG32 6QZ / GB | [2011/47] |
Former [2008/26] | 01 /
Sachs, Victor 106 The Woodfields Sanderstead Surrey, CR2 0HF / GB | ||
02 /
Thornhill, Craig Warren 6 Glenmore Close Thatcham Berkshire, RG19 3XR / GB | |||
03 /
McLean, Andrew Fenwick 12 Sadlers, Badgers Copse Tilehurst, Reading Berkshire, RG32 6QZ / GB | Representative(s) | Jones, Helen M.M. Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2011/47] |
Former [2008/26] | Jones, Helen M.M. Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06126645.8 | 20.12.2006 | [2008/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1935636 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1935636 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/47] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1935636 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/00, B65D51/20 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
B65D51/20 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/00 (KR);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B37/203 (EP,US);
B32B7/12 (KR);
B65D65/40 (KR);
B32B2310/024 (EP,US);
B32B2435/00 (EP,US);
B32B37/153 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/03] |
Former [2008/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Laminat | [2008/26] | English: | Laminate | [2008/26] | French: | Stratifié | [2008/26] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 25.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.08.2012
ADMISSIBLE Alfelder Kunststoffwerke Herm. Meyer GmbH Hildesheimer Strasse 78 31061 Alfeld/ Leine / DE Opponent's representative Einsel, Martin, et al, et al Patentanwälte Einsel & Kollegen Jasperallee 1a 38102 Braunschweig / DE | [2012/40] | 01.10.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.02.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.05.2015 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.05.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.06.2015 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.06.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 08.12.2015 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.11.2011 | BE | 23.11.2011 | CY | 23.11.2011 | CZ | 23.11.2011 | DK | 23.11.2011 | EE | 23.11.2011 | FI | 23.11.2011 | HU | 23.11.2011 | LT | 23.11.2011 | LV | 23.11.2011 | NL | 23.11.2011 | RO | 23.11.2011 | SE | 23.11.2011 | SI | 23.11.2011 | SK | 23.11.2011 | TR | 23.11.2011 | IE | 20.12.2011 | LU | 20.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | BG | 23.02.2012 | GR | 24.02.2012 | IS | 23.03.2012 | PT | 23.03.2012 | IT | 20.12.2014 | ES | 21.12.2014 | [2016/20] |
Former [2016/03] | AT | 23.11.2011 | |
BE | 23.11.2011 | ||
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
HU | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
TR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 20.12.2011 | ||
LU | 20.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
IT | 20.12.2014 | ||
Former [2013/45] | AT | 23.11.2011 | |
BE | 23.11.2011 | ||
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
HU | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
TR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 20.12.2011 | ||
LU | 20.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 23.11.2011 | |
BE | 23.11.2011 | ||
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
TR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 20.12.2011 | ||
LU | 20.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 23.11.2011 | |
BE | 23.11.2011 | ||
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 20.12.2011 | ||
LU | 20.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 23.11.2011 | |
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 23.11.2011 | |
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 23.11.2011 | |
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | BE | 23.11.2011 | |
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 23.11.2011 | |
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 23.11.2011 | |
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 23.11.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]WO03066465 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US], et al) [DX] 1-16 * claims 1-12 ** example - *; | [X]WO2006108853 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * claims 1-42 * | by applicant | US4961986 | EP1472153 | Opposition | EP0444865 | DE69119934T | WO03066465 | WO2006108853 | EP1837288 | - FALBE J. PROF. DR. ET AL, Römpp Chemie Lexikon, STUTTGART - NEW YORK, GEORG THIEME VERLAG, (1990), vol. 9, page 791 | - SOROKA W., CPP, "Institute of Packaging Professionals", ILLUSTRATED GLOSSARY OF PACKAGING TERMINOLOGY, (20081105), vol. 2, page 77 | - Declaration by Victor Sachs, including exhibits A-D and Appendix B | - SATAS D., Handbook of pressure sensitive adhesive technolog, NEW YORK, VAN NOSTRAND REINHOLD, (1989), vol. 2, pages 444 - 445 |