EP1837465 - Key for a lock cylinder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aug. Winkhaus GmbH & Co. KG August-Winkhaus-Strasse 31 48291 Telgte / DE | [2007/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kamm, Götz / Alte Salzstrasse 131 04209, Leipzig / DE | [2012/05] |
Former [2007/39] | 01 /
Kamm, Götz Alte Salzstrasse 131 04209, Leipzig / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/05] | Application number, filing date | 06126984.1 | 22.12.2006 | [2007/39] | Priority number, date | DE20061000126 | 20.03.2006 Original published format: DE102006000126 | [2007/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1837465 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1837465 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | [2007/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1837465 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E05B19/06 | [2007/39] | CPC: |
E05B19/0023 (EP);
E05B19/0052 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/39] | Title | German: | Schlüssel für einen Schliesszylinder | [2007/39] | English: | Key for a lock cylinder | [2007/39] | French: | Clé pour une serrure cylindrique | [2007/39] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/23] | 19.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.05.2009 | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2006 | CY | 01.02.2012 | DK | 01.02.2012 | EE | 01.02.2012 | FI | 01.02.2012 | IE | 01.02.2012 | LT | 01.02.2012 | LV | 01.02.2012 | RO | 01.02.2012 | SE | 01.02.2012 | SI | 01.02.2012 | SK | 01.02.2012 | TR | 01.02.2012 | BG | 01.05.2012 | GR | 02.05.2012 | IS | 01.06.2012 | PT | 01.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
IE | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
TR | 01.02.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
IE | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
IE | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
IE | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
IE | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
IE | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 01.02.2012 | |
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 01.02.2012 | |
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 01.02.2012 | |
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 01.02.2012 | |
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 01.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1462932 (RENÉ MARTIN ET ANDRÉ PAQUET) [X] 1,2 * page 2, column 1, lines 10-12; figures 2,4; claims 3,6 * * page 2, column 2, lines 2-5 *; | [YA]US3837197 (LOPEZ P) [Y] 5 * column 6, lines 13-16; figures 6-8 * [A] 1; | [A]DE2546551 (KARRENBERG FA WILHELM) [A] 1-3 * page 10, line 18 - page 11, line 4; figures 1-8 *; | [X]DE2924990 (KARRENBERG FA WILHELM) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 53 - column 4, line 15; figures 1,2,4,5; claims 2,3 *; | [A]US4635455 (OLIVER ROY N [US]) [A] 1,4,5 * column 3, lines 45-49; figure 7 *; | [XY]DE9211896U (GOLUB, DANIJEL) [X] 1,4 * page 9, lines 18-21; figures 1,14 * * page 10, lines 10-13; claim 3 * [Y] 5; | [A]DE19519600 (GOLUB DANIJEL [DE]) [A] 1,4,5* page 10, line 18 - line 23; figure 9 * | by applicant | DE2924990 | DE3935322 |