EP1767363 - Printing press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 29.03.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, CY, LI, TR | published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GOSS GRAPHIC SYSTEMS LIMITED Greenbank Street Preston, Lancashire PR1 7LA / GB | [2007/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lamb, Arthur 9 Winmarleigh Road Lancaster, Lancashire LA1 4LG / GB | 02 /
Hollings, Tony 20 Limefield Avenue Whalley, Lancashire BB7 9RJ / GB | 03 /
McCrone, John 181 Tulketh Road, Ashton Preston, Lancashire PR2 1ER / GB | [2007/13] | Representative(s) | Grey, Ian Michael Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/13] | Grey, Ian Michael Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06127038.5 | 07.07.2004 | [2007/13] | Priority number, date | GB20030015986 | 08.07.2003 Original published format: GB 0315986 | GB20040008085 | 08.04.2004 Original published format: GB 0408085 | [2007/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1767363 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1767363 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | [2007/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1767363 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B41F13/56, B65H45/28 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
B41F13/56 (EP);
B41F3/44 (GB);
B41F13/0024 (EP);
B41F13/14 (GB);
B41F13/193 (GB);
B41F31/30 (GB);
B41F7/12 (EP);
B65H29/40 (EP);
B65H45/16 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2007/13] | B41F31/30, B41F13/44, B41F13/56, B41F13/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/13] | Title | German: | Druckpresse | [2007/13] | English: | Printing press | [2007/13] | French: | Presse d'impression | [2007/13] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 16.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04743263.8 / EP1641621 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.08.2009
Koenig & Bauer AG Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | 02
13.08.2009
25.08.2009
ADMISSIBLE WIFAG Maschinenfabrik AG Wylerringstrasse 39 3001 Bern / CH Opponent's representative SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.08.2009
Koenig & Bauer AG Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | ||
02
13.08.2009
25.08.2009
ADMISSIBLE WIFAG Maschinenfabrik AG Wylerringstrasse 39 3001 Bern / CH Opponent's representative Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | |||
Former [2009/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.08.2009
ADMISSIBLE Koenig & Bauer AG Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | ||
02
13.08.2009
WIFAG Maschinenfabrik AG Wylerringstrasse 39 3001 Bern / CH Opponent's representative Gassenhuber, Andreas Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | 08.10.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.04.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.11.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.11.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2013/18] | 12.12.2012 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   26.09.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.12.2008 | BE | 03.12.2008 | CH | 03.12.2008 | CY | 03.12.2008 | CZ | 03.12.2008 | DK | 03.12.2008 | EE | 03.12.2008 | FI | 03.12.2008 | IT | 03.12.2008 | LI | 03.12.2008 | NL | 03.12.2008 | PL | 03.12.2008 | RO | 03.12.2008 | SI | 03.12.2008 | SK | 03.12.2008 | TR | 03.12.2008 | BG | 03.03.2009 | SE | 03.03.2009 | GR | 04.03.2009 | ES | 14.03.2009 | PT | 04.05.2009 | HU | 04.06.2009 | GB | 07.07.2009 | IE | 07.07.2009 | LU | 07.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | [2013/33] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IT | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
HU | 04.06.2009 | ||
GB | 07.07.2009 | ||
IE | 07.07.2009 | ||
LU | 07.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IT | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
GB | 07.07.2009 | ||
IE | 07.07.2009 | ||
LU | 07.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IT | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
GB | 07.07.2009 | ||
IE | 07.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
GB | 07.07.2009 | ||
IE | 07.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/41] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
GB | 07.07.2009 | ||
IE | 07.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/26] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
GB | 07.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/02] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 03.12.2008 | |
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/28] | FI | 03.12.2008 | |
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 14.03.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4861326 (KUEHNER RUDOLF [DE], et al); | [A]DE4332792 (ZIRKON DRUCKMASCHINEN GMBH [DE]); | [A]US5775222 (ZWEIFEL JOHANN [CH], et al); | [A]US6338707 (MICHALIK HORST BERNHARD [DE]) |