EP1803855 - Upper swing body for an excavator with minimized rear protrusion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Doosan Infracore Co., Ltd. 7-11 Hwasu-dong Dong-gu Incheon 401-020 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/27] | For all designated states Doosan Infracore Co., Ltd. 7-11 Hwasu-dong Dong-gu Incheon 401-020 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Youn, In Mook 101-1002, Hangang Town Apt., Gayang 1 (il)-dong Gangseo-gu 157-752 Seoul / KR | [2007/27] | Representative(s) | Axelsson, Nils Ake A.L. Groth & Co. KB Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/27] | Axelsson, Nils Ake A.L. Groth & Co. KB, Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 06127107.8 | 22.12.2006 | [2007/27] | Priority number, date | KR20050130228 | 27.12.2005 Original published format: KR 20050130228 | [2007/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1803855 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1803855 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/08, E02F9/12, B60K11/06 | [2007/27] | CPC: |
E02F3/325 (EP,US);
E02F9/00 (KR);
B60K11/04 (EP,US);
E02F9/0866 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/20] |
Former [2007/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Drehbarer Oberwagen eines Baggers mit minimiertem Hecküberstand | [2007/27] | English: | Upper swing body for an excavator with minimized rear protrusion | [2007/27] | French: | Tourelle d'une excavatrice avec une saillie réduite à la partie arrière | [2007/27] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 06.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/16] | 26.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE19839783 (KUBOTA KK [JP]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2-4; | [X]JPH08302736 (KUBOTA KK) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]JP2002371590 (KUBOTA KK) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPH06144022 (YANMAR DIESEL ENGINE CO) [Y] 2-4 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE19849035 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 2-4 * the whole document *; | [XY]JPH09268597 (KUBOTA KK) [X] 1,5 * the whole document * [Y] 6; | [XY]JPH07207702 (KUBOTA KK) [X] 1,5 * the whole document * [Y] 6 |