Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
27.03.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] |
03.12.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
07.12.2007 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] |
07.12.2007 | Request for examination filed | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] |