EP1679854 - Apparatus and method for creating control code for home network appliance according to resolution of control device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/28] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoon, Su-jeong No607-1006 Siyeong 6-danji Jangmi Apt Hagye 2-dong Nowon-gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
Kwon, O-sbik No. B-637 Daelim Acrotel 168-1 Jeongja-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Song, Kwan-woo No. 109-1805 Dongseong 1-cha Apt. Jukjeon 2-dong Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Kim, Sun-hyung No. 501, 35-1 Nokbeon-dong Eunpyeong-gu Seoul / KR | [2006/28] | Representative(s) | Robinson, Ian Michael, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/28] | Robinson, Ian Michael, et al Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 06250097.0 | 10.01.2006 | [2006/28] | Priority number, date | KR20050002588 | 11.01.2005 Original published format: KR 2005002588 | [2006/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1679854 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1679854 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08 | [2006/28] | CPC: |
H04L12/2803 (EP,US);
G06Q10/10 (KR);
H04L12/12 (KR);
H04L12/28 (KR);
H04L12/282 (EP,US);
H04L12/2825 (EP,US);
H04L67/02 (EP,US);
H04L67/025 (EP,US);
H04L67/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2007/12] |
Former [2006/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gerät und Verfahren zur Erzeugung von Steuerungskode für ein Gerät in einem Heimnetzsystem in Abhängigkeit von der Auflösung einer Steuervorrichtung | [2006/28] | English: | Apparatus and method for creating control code for home network appliance according to resolution of control device | [2006/28] | French: | Appareil et méthode de création de code de commande pour un appareil de réseau domestique en fonction de la résolution graphique d'un dispositif de contrôle | [2006/28] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/28] | 12.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.04.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.02.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6023714 (HILL WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 1, line 28 - line 38 * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0058] * * column 2, line 40 - line 54 * * column 8, line 48 - column 9, line 54 * * column 11, line 24 - line 58 *; | [A]US2003037076 (BRAVERY ANDREW JAMES FREDERICK [GB], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0058] *; | [A]US2004061713 (JENNINGS TERRY D [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraphs [0031] , [0032] *; | [A] - MIKKO HONKALA PABLO CESAR PETRI VUORIMAA, "A Device Independent XML User Agent for Multimedia Terminals", MULTIMEDIA SOFTWARE ENGINEERING, 2004. PROCEEDINGS. IEEE SIXTH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MIAMI, FL, USA 13-15 DEC. 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20041213), ISBN 0-7695-2217-3, pages 116 - 123, XP010757237 [A] 1-14 * page 1 - page 7 * | [A] - MARC ABRAMS & CONTANTINOS PHANOURIOU, "UIML: An XML Language for Building Device-Independent User Interfaces", XML CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. PROCEEDINGS OF XML, (199912), XP002161335 [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 116, column R * * page 117, column L * * page 118, column L * |