EP1683756 - Beer dispensing system with temperature selection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lancer Partnership, Ltd. 6655 Lancer Blvd. San Antonio, TX 78219 / US | [2006/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haskayne, Paul Clematis Cottage Yew Tree Fam Middlewich Road Lower-Peover Cheshire County WA16 9QD / GB | [2006/30] | Representative(s) | Shanks, Andrew, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Shanks, Andrew, et al Marks & Clerk Scotland 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | ||
Former [2006/30] | Shanks, Andrew, et al Marks & Clerk 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 06250292.7 | 19.01.2006 | [2006/30] | Priority number, date | US20050040153 | 21.01.2005 Original published format: US 40153 | [2006/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1683756 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1683756 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | [2006/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1683756 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B67D1/08, B67D1/14 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
B67D1/1405 (EP,US);
B67D1/0861 (EP,US);
B67D1/0862 (EP,US);
B67D1/0867 (EP,US);
B67D1/0884 (EP,US);
B67D1/0888 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/30] | Title | German: | Bierschankvorrichtung mit Temperaturwähler | [2006/30] | English: | Beer dispensing system with temperature selection | [2006/30] | French: | Système de distribution de bière avec sélection de température | [2006/30] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/17] | 30.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.07.2008 | BE | 30.07.2008 | CY | 30.07.2008 | CZ | 30.07.2008 | DK | 30.07.2008 | EE | 30.07.2008 | FI | 30.07.2008 | LT | 30.07.2008 | LV | 30.07.2008 | NL | 30.07.2008 | PL | 30.07.2008 | RO | 30.07.2008 | SI | 30.07.2008 | SK | 30.07.2008 | TR | 30.07.2008 | BG | 30.10.2008 | SE | 30.10.2008 | GR | 31.10.2008 | IS | 30.11.2008 | PT | 30.12.2008 | IE | 19.01.2009 | LU | 19.01.2009 | HU | 31.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
PL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
GR | 31.10.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
IE | 19.01.2009 | ||
LU | 19.01.2009 | ||
HU | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
PL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
GR | 31.10.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
IE | 19.01.2009 | ||
LU | 19.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
PL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
GR | 31.10.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
IE | 19.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/26] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
PL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
IE | 19.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
IE | 19.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
IE | 19.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/02] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/28] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | LT | 30.07.2008 | |
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 30.07.2008 | |
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2362104 (SMITH LEONARD C) [X] 17 * page 1, column 1, line 27 - line 48 * * page 1, column 2, line 6 - line 23; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE2155758 (EISVOIGT VOIGTLÄNDER) [X] 20,21 * column 2, line 61 - line 66 * * column 4, line 4 - line 9 *; | [X]GB2146705 (GUINESS SON AND COMPANY ARTHUR) [X] 1-5,7 * page 3, line 113 - line 127 * * page 5, line 11 - line 15; figure 1 *; | [XY]US5009082 (ABRAHAM III MARTIN J [US]) [X] 17 * column 4, line 43 - line 47 * * column 5, line 13 - line 63; figures 1,2,5 * [Y] 18; | [Y]WO9842613 (SCOTTISH & NEWCASTLE PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 18 * page 13, line 3 - line 14 * * page 13, line 31 - line 34 * * page 14, line 16 - line 26 *; | [X]US5896748 (PARK EUN-KYUNG [KR]) [X] 20,21 * column 3, line 58 - line 64 * * column 5, line 22 - line 26 ** column 5, line 57 - line 67 *; | [X]US5970732 (MENIN BORIS [IL], et al) [X] 9,10,13-16 * column 6, line 41 - line 44 * * column 8, line 35 - line 57; figure 3 *; | [X]WO0240179 (SHURFLO PUMP MFG CO INC [US]) [X] 9-12 * page 11, line 17 - line 27; figure 5 * * page 23, line 24 - page 24, line 17 *; | [X]EP1380536 (IMI CORNELIUS UK LTD [GB]) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0061] - [0063] - [0087] - [0090]; figure 1 *; | [PX]EP1502897 (CELLI SPA [IT]) [PX] 1-4 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0017]; figures 1,2 * |