EP1690556 - Absorbent articles comprising polyamine-coated superabsorbent polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah WI 54956 / US | ||
Former [2006/33] | For all designated states Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laumer, Jason Matthew 1409 East Bedford Lane Appleton, Wisconsin 54915 / US | 02 /
Miatudila, Ma-Ikay Kikama 105 Price Point Drive Monroe, North Carolina 28110 / US | 03 /
Herfert, Norbert 3204 Trefoil Drive Charlotte, North Carolina 28266 / US | 04 /
Mitchell, Michael A. 8805 Sweetwater Place Waxhaw, North Carolina 28173 / US | [2006/33] | Representative(s) | Beacham, Annabel Rose Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/33] | Beacham, Annabel Rose Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06250513.6 | 31.01.2006 | [2006/33] | Priority number, date | US20050049095 | 01.02.2005 Original published format: US 49095 | [2006/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1690556 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1690556 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | [2007/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61L15/60 | [2006/33] | CPC: |
C08L101/14 (EP,US);
A61L15/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/31] |
Former [2006/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Absorbierende Artikel umfassend polyaminbeschichtete superabsorbierende Polymere | [2006/33] | English: | Absorbent articles comprising polyamine-coated superabsorbent polymers | [2006/33] | French: | Articles absorbants comprenant des polymères superabsorbants revêtus de polyamines | [2006/33] | Examination procedure | 08.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 20.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/18] | 19.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/18] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.01.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 16.01.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002128618 (FRENZ VOLKER [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-7,11-24,29 * page 3, paragraphs 47-50 * * page 5, paragraphs 66,71 * * page 6, paragraphs 83,92 * * page 7, paragraphs 92-96 * * claims 4-11 *; | [X]WO03043670 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-35 * page 23, lines 1-9 * * page 32, lines 13-27 * * page 35, lines 44-46 * * page 41, line 17 - page 42, line 33 * * table 6 * * claims 1-4,12,13,25 *; | [A]WO03002623 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-35 * page 1, lines 12-16 * * page 13, lines 35-39 * * page 30, lines 26-45 *; | [A]US2004039360 (EHRNSPERGER BRUNO [DE], et al) [A] 1-35 * page 4, paragraphs 25-31 * * page 5, paragraphs 31,32,45-48 *; | [E]WO2006082189 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [E] 1-35 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1690555 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [E] 1-35 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1685858 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [E] 1-35 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO0037009 | US4940464 | US5766389 | US6645190 | US5883028 | US5116662 | US5114781 | US6552245 | US6641134 | US5486166 | US5490846 | US5820973 | US4076663 | US4286082 | US4654039 | US5145906 | US4340706 | US4497930 | US4666975 | US4507438 | US4683274 | US4734478 | US3849241 | US5350624 | US4100324 | US4587154 | US4604313 | US4655757 | US4724114 | GB2151272 | US6362389 | US2006004336 | US6387495 | US2005027268 | EP0615736 | - SURFACE AND COLLOID SCIENCE - EXPERIMENTAL METHODS, PLENUM PRESS, (1979), vol. II | - V. A. WENDT; E. L. BOONE; C. D. FLUHARTY, "Manufacture of Super-Fine Organic Fibers", NRL REPORT 4364 | - K. D. LAWRENCE; R. T. LUKAS; J. A. YOUNG, "An Improved Device For the Formation of Super-Fine Thermoplastic Fibers", NRL REPORT 5265 |