25.03.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] |
28.01.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2011 [2011/09] |
03.09.2010 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] |
25.09.2009 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] |
18.09.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
18.09.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
31.07.2009 |
Change - name/address |
published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] |
22.05.2009 |
Change - classification |
published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] |
15.05.2009 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.02.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.09.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.05.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.02.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.05.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.03.2007 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] |
19.01.2007 |
First examination report |
|
16.01.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.12.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.08.2006 |
First examination report |
|
29.07.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.07.2006 |
Publication of search report |
published on 16.08.2006 [2006/33] |
07.07.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] |
07.07.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] |