Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006176815 | Global Dossier | 10.08.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US4995205 | 04.02.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20060089666 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US4995205 | 04.02.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2006217623 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US4995205 | 04.02.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1689207 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2009 | B1 | EP1689207 | 16.08.2006 | A3 | EP1689207 | 09.08.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US4995205 | 04.02.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1874599 | 06.12.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US4995205 | 04.02.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006009978D1 | 10.12.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US4995205 | 04.02.2005 |