EP1688778 - Optical scanning imaging system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ju-hyun, Lee 214-1301 Family 2-danji Apt. Munjeong 2-dong Songpa-gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
Yong-Kweun, Mun 403-1801 Geumhwa Mael Jugong Apt. Sanggal-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2006/32] | Representative(s) | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/32] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 06250602.7 | 03.02.2006 | [2006/32] | Priority number, date | KR20050011415 | 07.02.2005 Original published format: KR 2005011415 | [2006/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1688778 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1688778 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/12, G02F1/35, H04N9/31 | [2006/32] | CPC: |
H04N9/3129 (EP,US);
G09B3/06 (KR);
G02B26/105 (EP,US);
G02B26/125 (EP,US);
G09B1/22 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/16] |
Former [2006/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Optisches Scan-Bildgebungssystem | [2006/32] | English: | Optical scanning imaging system | [2006/32] | French: | Système d'imagerie à balayage optique | [2006/32] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 05.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5715021 (GIBEAU FRANK C [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 12, line 9 - line 39 * * column 13, line 22 - line 40 * * column 22, line 30 - line 63 * * figures 6a,7a,12 *; | [A]US5892556 (DETER CHRISTHARD [DE]) [A] 1-11 * figure 4 * * column 8, line 26 - line 58 *; | [A] - REINTJES J ET AL, "Direct observation of the orientation Kerr effect in the self-focusing of picosecond pulses", PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS USA, (19720626), vol. 28, no. 26, ISSN 0031-9007, pages 1697 - 1700, XP002376386 [A] 1-11 * page 1697, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 1 * * page 1698, column L, paragraph 2 * * figure 2a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevLett.28.1697 | [A] - VAMPOUILLE M ET AL, "Application of controlled self-focusing in CS2 to shortening picosecond laser pulses", OPTICAL AND QUANTUM ELECTRONICS UK, (198205), vol. 14, no. 3, ISSN 0306-8919, pages 253 - 261, XP001246753 [A] 1-11 * 1. Introduction * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00619605 | [A] - MANSOOR SHEIK-BAHAE ET AL, "SENSITIVE MEASUREMENT OF OPTICAL NONLINEARITIES USING A SINGLE BEAM", IEEE JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19900401), vol. 26, no. 4, ISSN 0018-9197, pages 760 - 769, XP000149716 [A] 1-11 * page 760 - page 761, column L * * page 764, paragraph L - page 765, column R, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/3.53394 | by applicant | US6636339 |