EP1696109 - Method of manufacturing a plugged honeycomb structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/35] | Method of manufacturing plugged honeycomb structure and plugged honeycomb structure | ||
[2012/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-City, Aichi Pref. 467-8530 / JP | [2013/33] |
Former [2006/35] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-City, Aichi Pref. 467-8530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ichikawa, Yukihito, c/o NGK Insulators, Ltd. Legal Affairs & I.P. Dept. 2-56 Suda-cho,Mizuho-ku Nagoya City, Aichi-ken 467-8530 / JP | [2013/33] |
Former [2006/35] | 01 /
Ichikawa, Yukihito, c/o NGK Insulators, Ltd. Legal Affairs & I.P. Dept. 2-56 Suda-cho,Mizuho-ku Nagoya City, Aichi-ken 467-8530 / JP | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/33] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2006/35] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 06250885.8 | 20.02.2006 | [2006/35] | Priority number, date | JP20050047367 | 23.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005047367 | [2006/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1696109 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1696109 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | [2006/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1696109 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B01D39/20 | [2012/51] | CPC: |
C04B38/0012 (EP,US);
B01D46/0001 (EP,US);
B01D46/2459 (EP,US);
B01D46/2482 (EP,US);
B01D46/2486 (US);
B01D46/2498 (EP,US);
B01D53/9454 (EP,US);
B28B11/006 (EP);
B01D2255/102 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20707 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20723 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20761 (EP,US);
B01D2255/50 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00793 (EP,US);
C04B2111/0081 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y10S264/48 (EP,US);
Y10S55/05 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B38/0012, C04B35/195 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/35] | F01N3/022, B01D39/20, B01D53/94 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2007/22] |
Former [2006/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren für eine abgedichtete Wabenstruktur | [2012/51] | English: | Method of manufacturing a plugged honeycomb structure | [2012/51] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de structure en nid d'abeille scellée | [2012/51] |
Former [2006/35] | Abgedichtete Wabenstruktur und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | ||
Former [2006/35] | Method of manufacturing plugged honeycomb structure and plugged honeycomb structure | ||
Former [2006/35] | Structure en nid d'abeille scellée et procédé pour sa production | Examination procedure | 15.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/19] | 23.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 28.02.2014 | [2015/08] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6297636 ; | [X]US4455180 (HILLMAN ARTHUR E [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 47; claim 1 *; | [X]US4568402 (OGAWA YUTAKA [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 4, lines 7-14; claim 1 *; | [A]US4786542 (YASUDA KEIJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 5, line 1323; figures 5-8; claims 1,11 *; | [A]EP1418032 (NGK INSULATOR LTD [JP]) [A] 9-11 * paragraph [0017]; figures 5,8; claim 8 *; | [DXA]EP1450015 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [DX] 9,10 * figures 5-8; claim 1 * * paragraphs [0033] , [0045] - [0046] * [A] 1-8 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871007), vol. 011, no. 307, Database accession no. (C - 450), & JP62097636 A 19870507 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 9 * abstract * | Examination | WO2005005017 | EP1666118 | by applicant | JP2001269585 | JP2004251137 |